Lynch v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-01455 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1391 Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 17, 2021 |
Case in other court: | West Virginia Northern, 3:21-cv-00066 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 13, 2021 5:04 AM EST |
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment CO
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard
|
|
Defendant
EI Dupont De Nemours & Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
successor-in-trust to THE ANSUL COMPANY One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Plaintiff
John Paul Lynch
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, June 04, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/04 2:42 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Monday, May 17, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 05/17 2:37 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: West Virginia Northern, 3:21-cv-00066, Lynch v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-1455-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
3 | 3
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 05/17 2:35 PM
Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Northern; Case Number 3:21-cv-00066. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 05/17 1:09 PM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-52) - 2 action(s) re: pldg. ( 991 in MDL No. 2873, 1 in NYS/7:21-cv-03943, 1 in WVN/3:21-cv-00066) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to the District of South Carolina for the reasons stated in the order of December 7, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 5/17/2021. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2873, NYS/7:21-cv-03943, WVN/3:21-cv-00066. (cwm) |
|
Case transferred to District of South Carolina. Entire Case file electronically transmitted. (cwm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 5/17/2021.] | ||
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Not MDL
Mon 05/17 1:11 PM
Case transferred to District of South Carolina. Entire Case file electronically transmitted. (cwm) |
||
Monday, May 03, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Chemguard, E.I. Dupont De Nemours & Co., The Chemours Co. LLC, and Tyco Fire Products L.P., filed by John Paul Lynch. Filing Fee $402.00 - Receipt #0424-3251445. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cwm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 5/17/2021.] |