New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Brian M Cogan
Case #: 1:14-cv-04309
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 14, 2014
Terminated:Nov 06, 2014
Last checked: Monday Jan 19, 2015 4:50 AM EST
Defendant
Rhapsody International, Inc.
Represented By
Christine Lepera
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP
contact info
John Matthew Williams
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Yesh Music, LLC
Represented By
Richard M. Garbarini
Garbarini Fitzgerald P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, November 13, 2014
30 30 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Rocco, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order dismissing case
Thursday, November 06, 2014
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The Court having been advised that this matter has settled, the case is dismissed, subject to reinstatement at the request of any party within 30 days. The Court retains jurisdiction to So Order any settlement documents if they are submitted within this period. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/6/2014. (Cogan, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 05, 2014
29 29 NOTICE of Settlement by Yesh Music, LLC (Garbarini, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 27, 2014
28 28 Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference from November 3, 2014 by Rhapsody International, Inc.. (Williams, John)
Related: [-]
27 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against Rhapsody International, Inc., filed by Yesh Music, LLC. (Garbarini, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-E,
Att: 4 Exhibit F,
Att: 5 Exhibit G-K,
Att: 6 Exhibit L-N,
Att: 7 Exhibit O-Z
ORDER granting28 Motion to Adjourn Conference to 11/10/2014 at 4:30 pm in Chambers 704S. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/27/2014. (Weisberg, Peggy)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 24, 2014
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will hold a discovery conference on 11/3/2014 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 704S. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/24/2014. (Weisberg, Peggy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 23, 2014
26 26 DECISION AND ORDER dated 10/22/14 that plaintiff's17 Motion for Judgment on the pleadings is DENIED. Plaintiff is to file the Second Amended Complaint16 forthwith. By separate order, the court will set a discovery conference and impose a prompt schedule. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/22/2014 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 20, 2014
25 25 REPLY in Opposition re17 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Infringement Claim and Request to file Sur-Reply filed by Rhapsody International, Inc.. (Lepera, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Williams,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. C,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. D
Tuesday, October 14, 2014
24 24 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re17 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Infringement Claim Rich Garbarini filed by Yesh Music, LLC. (Garbarini, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-11,
Att: 2 Exhibit 12,
Att: 3 Exhibit 12.1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 12.2
23 23 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re17 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Infringement Claim Richard Cupola filed by Yesh Music, LLC. (Garbarini, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-G
22 22 REPLY in Support re17 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Infringement Claim filed by Yesh Music, LLC. (Garbarini, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 06, 2014
21 21 RESPONSE to Motion re16 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement First Amended Complaint filed by Rhapsody International, Inc.. (Lepera, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Williams,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. A
20 20 30+ pgs MEMORANDUM in Opposition re17 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Infringement Claim filed by Rhapsody International, Inc.. (Lepera, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Williams,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. C,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. D,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. E
Tuesday, September 23, 2014
19 19 4 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support re16 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement First Amended Complaint filed by Yesh Music, LLC. (Garbarini, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-F,
Att: 3 Exhibit G-K,
Att: 4 Exhibit L-N,
Att: 5 Exhibit O-Z
Monday, September 22, 2014
18 18 28 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support re17 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Infringement Claim filed by Yesh Music, LLC. (Garbarini, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A-F to SAC,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit G-K to SAC,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit L-N to SAC,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit O-Z,
Att: 6 Exhibit Proposed Order
17 17 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Infringement Claim by Yesh Music, LLC. Responses due by 10/6/2014 (Garbarini, Richard)
Related: [-]
16 16 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement First Amended Complaint by Yesh Music, LLC. (Garbarini, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 19, 2014
Minute Entry and Order for Initial Status Conference held before Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/19/14. Both sides present. The Court granted plaintiff's request for leave to file a motion for partial judgment on the pleadings. Plaintiff shall file its motion no later than 9/22/14; defendant shall respond no later than 10/6/14. Discovery is held in abeyance pending further Order. (Weisberg, Peggy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 17, 2014
15 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Rhapsody International, Inc., filed by Yesh Music, LLC. (Garbarini, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A US Copyright Registrations,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Assignments,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Stream report
Monday, September 15, 2014
14 14 Letter Filed Jointly by all Parties by Yesh Music, LLC (Garbarini, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 05, 2014
13 13 ANSWER to1 Complaint,, by Rhapsody International, Inc.. (Williams, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 20, 2014
12 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rhapsody International, Inc. (Williams, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 19, 2014
ORDER granting10 Motion to Adjourn. Initial Status Conference adjourned to 9/19/2014 at 11:30 am in Chambers 704S. Parties are reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements for the conference at5 . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/19/2014. (Weisberg, Peggy)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 18, 2014
11 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John Matthew Williams on behalf of Rhapsody International, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Williams, John)
Related: [-]
10 10 First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Rhapsody International, Inc.. (Lepera, Christine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 06, 2014
9 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Rhapsody International, Inc.'s answer due 9/5/2014. Further extensions are unlikely. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/6/2014. (Barrett, C)
Related: [-]
8 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, or to otherwise respond, by Rhapsody International, Inc.. (Lepera, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order and Stipulation
7 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Lepera on behalf of Rhapsody International, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Lepera, Christine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 31, 2014
6 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yesh Music, LLC. Rhapsody International, Inc. served on 7/16/2014, answer due 8/6/2014. (Garbarini, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 17, 2014
5 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 9/2/2014 at 4:30 PM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/17/2014. (Weisberg, Peggy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 16, 2014
4 4 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Rocco, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Copyright Registrations,
Att: 3 Exhibit Copyright Registrations,
Att: 4 Exhibit Copyright Registrations
3 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. The following corrections were made: none. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 14, 2014
2 2 Summons Issued as to Rhapsody International, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Rhapsody International, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-7065128 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Yesh Music, LLC. (Garbarini, Richard) (Layne, Monique).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Copyright Registrations,
Att: 2 Exhibit Copyright Registrations,
Att: 3 Exhibit Copyright Registrations,
Att: 4 Exhibit Stream and Sale Data
Att: 5 (7/15/2014) Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 (7/15/2014) Proposed Summons
Case assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]