Moore et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-01503 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 20, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 16, 2021 3:29 AM EST |
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DuPont de Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
individually and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Incorporated
2 Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Eric Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kris Moore
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/10 6:41 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Only, of Particular Personal Injury Claims, Without Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) & Second Amended Case Management Order No. 28 Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(London, Michael) |
|
Thursday, May 20, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 05/20 4:26 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Moore et al v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-1503-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Central California (sshe, ) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 05/20 4:25 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 05/20 4:24 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9857187.), filed by Kris Moore, Eric Moore. Service due by 8/18/2021(sshe, ) |