New York Southern District Court
Judge:Victoria Reznik
Case #: 7:21-cv-04620
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:May 24, 2021
Terminated:Apr 01, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 20, 2021 4:08 AM EST
Defendant
Christopher Cassano
Represented By
Hillary Jacobs Raimondi
Traub Lieberman Straus & Shrewsbury LLP
contact info
Defendant
Cesar Chavez Public School
Represented By
Joanna Marie Topping
Abrams, Fensterman, Fensterman, Et Al.
contact info
Marissa Vitolo
Abrams Fensterman Fensterman, Et Al.
contact info
Defendant
City of Yonkers
Represented By
Joanna Marie Topping
Abrams, Fensterman, Fensterman, Et Al.
contact info
Marissa Vitolo
Abrams Fensterman Fensterman, Et Al.
contact info
Defendant
Sandra Guzman
Represented By
Joseph James DiPalma
Jackson Lewis P.C. (wp)
contact info
Caitlin L. O'Fallon
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Evelina Medina
Represented By
Julie Pechersky
Oxman Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Marc S. Oxman
Oxman Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Dr. Edwin M. Quezada
Represented By
Joanna Marie Topping
Abrams, Fensterman, Fensterman, Et Al.
contact info
Marissa Vitolo
Abrams Fensterman Fensterman, Et Al.
contact info
Defendant
Robert C. Dodson Public School
Represented By
Joanna Marie Topping
Abrams, Fensterman, Fensterman, Et Al.
contact info
Marissa Vitolo
Abrams Fensterman Fensterman, Et Al.
contact info
Defendant
Yonkers Public School District
Represented By
Joanna Marie Topping
Abrams, Fensterman, Fensterman, Et Al.
contact info
Marissa Vitolo
Abrams Fensterman Fensterman, Et Al.
contact info
Plaintiff
Gisselle Vasquez
Represented By
Melissa Alexis Rodriguez
Berlingieri Law, PLLC
contact info
Christopher J. Berlingieri
Berlingieri Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 47 minutes ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
99 99 appeal USCA Mandate Tue 04/15 10:04 AM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to98 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gisselle Vasquez USCA Case Number 24-1220 Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 4/14/2025. (tp)
Related: [-]