California Central District Court
Judge:Christina A Snyder
Referred: Charles F Eick
Case #: 2:21-cv-04386
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:May 26, 2021
Terminated:Jan 12, 2022
Last checked: Monday Nov 22, 2021 12:46 AM PST
Defendant
Tracy Renaud
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Fatimargentina M Lacayo
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Chung Hae Han
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Naketa Fadale Andrews
Represented By
David M Sturman
David Sturman Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff
Marianna Nikolayevna Busel
Represented By
David M Sturman
David Sturman Law Offices
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
14 14 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Wed 01/12 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Naketa Fadale Andrews, Marianna Nikolayevna Busel. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Sturman, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 09/28 11:22 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Chung Hae Han counsel for Defendant Tracy Renaud. Adding Chung H. Han as counsel of record for Tracy Renaud for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Tracy Renaud. (Attorney Chung Hae Han added to party Tracy Renaud(pty:dft))(Han, Chung)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 18, 2021
12 12 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Thu 08/19 11:58 AM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY APPROXIMATELY 140 DAYS,11 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants response to the Complaint shall be filed on or before January 14, 2022. (shb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 16, 2021
11 11 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Mon 08/16 3:38 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 1/14/2022 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Tracy Renaud.(Lacayo, Fatimargentina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, July 26, 2021
10 10 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Mon 07/26 9:23 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Tracy Renaud answer now due 8/27/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Tracy Renaud.(Lacayo, Fatimargentina)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 16, 2021
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 07/16 11:41 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Fatimargentina M Lacayo counsel for Defendant Tracy Renaud. Adding Fatima Lacayo as counsel of record for Tracy Renaud for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Tracy Renaud. (Attorney Fatimargentina M Lacayo added to party Tracy Renaud(pty:dft))(Lacayo, Fatimargentina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 22, 2021
8 8 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Tue 06/22 11:41 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Naketa Fadale Andrews, Marianna Nikolayevna Busel, upon Defendant Tracy Renaud served on 6/1/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Veloz. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Ealy Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Unknown. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached.(Sturman, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Proof of Service on Defendant,
Att: 2 Supplement Proof of Service of Attorney General
Thursday, June 10, 2021
7 7 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 06/10 2:32 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 27, 2021
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 05/27 12:06 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Tracy Renaud. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 05/27 11:10 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 26, 2021
4 4 notice Summons Request Wed 05/26 1:56 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff NAKETA FADALE ANDREWS; MARIANNA NIKOLAYEVNA BUSEL. (Sturman, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 05/26 1:54 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff NAKETA FADALE ANDREWS; MARIANNA NIKOLAYEVNA BUSEL, (Sturman, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 05/26 1:52 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff NAKETA FADALE ANDREWS; MARIANNA NIKOLAYEVNA BUSEL. (Sturman, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 05/26 1:42 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31361226 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff NAKETA FADALE ANDREWS; MARIANNA NIKOLAYEVNA BUSEL. (Attorney David M Sturman added to party NAKETA FADALE ANDREWS; MARIANNA NIKOLAYEVNA BUSEL(pty:pla))(Sturman, David)
Related: [-]