Franks v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-01577 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 27, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 23, 2021 3:37 AM EST |
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Coporation Trust Company 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corp
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Pat Franks
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 01, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Status Report
Thu 07/01 1:58 PM
STATUS REPORT - Defendant BASF Corporation's General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by BASF Corp, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Friday, May 28, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 05/28 8:51 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Franks v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-1577-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Middle Georgia (Athens Division) (sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, May 27, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 05/28 8:50 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 05/28 8:50 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9871229.), filed by Pat Franks. Service due by 8/25/2021(sshe, ) |