Kallam v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-01590 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 27, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 23, 2021 4:01 AM EST |
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Coporation Trust Company 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Francis J Kallam, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, June 17, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Status Report
Thu 06/17 2:15 PM
STATUS REPORT - Defendant BASF Corporation's General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by BASF Corp, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Friday, May 28, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 05/28 9:36 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Kallam v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-1590-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern Pennsylvania (sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, May 27, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 05/28 9:35 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 05/28 9:32 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9873003.), filed by Francis J Kallam, Jr. Service due by 8/25/2021(sshe, ) Modified document number on 5/28/2021 (sshe, ) |