Kennedy v. Airgas USA, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Gregory R Schaaf |
Case #: | 5:21-ap-05038 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2021 |
Terminated: | Feb 09, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Airgas USA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ellen Arvin Kennedy, solely in her capacity as the Liquidating Trustee of the Cambrian Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 09, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 02/09 9:54 AM
Adversary Proceeding 21-5038 Closed. (rah) |
||
Tuesday, February 08, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Notice of Dismissal Filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Barber, T.) |
|
Tuesday, January 25, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Order to File Status Report or Take Other Action within fourteen days. (lmu) |
|
Wednesday, November 17, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Order GRANTING Motion to Extend Time to File an Answer (awd) |
|
Monday, November 15, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Motion to Extend Time in Which the Defendant May Answer or Otherwise Respond, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Barber, T.) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, November 11, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Barber, T.) |
|
Thursday, September 23, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Order GRANTING Motion to Extend Time to File an Answer (awd) |
|
Wednesday, September 22, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Barber, T.) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, August 16, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Order GRANTING Motion to Extend Time to Answer or otherwise Respond (awd) |
|
Friday, August 13, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Barber, T.) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, June 22, 2021 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 06/22 4:11 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-05038 grs] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 312970, amount $ 350.00 for Complaint (Doc#1688) filed in Lead Case 19-51200 Complaint applies to jointly administered case 19-51214 (nak) |
||
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/22 6:15 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by BP. Receipt Number 312971. (admin) Complaint (Doc#1688) |
||
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/22 6:15 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by BP. Receipt Number 312972. (admin) Complaint (Doc#1688) |
||
Monday, June 14, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (awd) |
|
2 | 2
court
Entry
Mon 06/14 11:15 AM
Entry - See Bankruptcy Case No. 19-51200 (ECF No. 1668) for the Order which establishes procedures re filing fees, summons and orders for trial for this proceeding. (awd) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-05038 Complaint, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy, solely in her capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the Cambrian Liquidating Trust against Airgas USA, LLC Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Barber, T.) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |