Kennedy v. The Cincinnati Mine Machinery Company
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Gregory R Schaaf |
Case #: | 5:21-ap-05048 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jan 20, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
The Cincinnati Mine Machinery Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ellen Arvin Kennedy, solely in her capacity as the Liquidating Trustee of the Cambrian Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, January 18, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Notice of Satisfaction Filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Barber, T.) |
|
Thursday, January 20, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 01/20 2:19 PM
Adversary Proceeding 21-5048 Closed. (rah) |
||
Wednesday, January 05, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Certificate of Service , filed by T. Kent Barber . (Barber, T.) |
|
Tuesday, January 04, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Order GRANTING Motion For Default Judgment (awd) |
|
Friday, December 10, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Motion for Default Judgment against The Cincinnati Mine Machinery Company, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy. Last day to file objections: 12/28/2021 . (Barber, T.) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Thursday, December 09, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Clerk's Entry of Default, The Cincinnati Mine Machinery Company. (rah) |
|
Tuesday, December 07, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Request for Clerk's Entry of Default. (Barber, T.) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, December 02, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Order to File a Status Report or take other action to advance this proceeding. Document due by 12/16/2021. (awd) |
|
Wednesday, June 30, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Barber, T.) |
|
Tuesday, June 22, 2021 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 06/22 4:39 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-05048 grs] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 312984, amount $ 350.00 for Complaint (Doc#1698) filed in Lead Case 19-51200 Complaint applies to jointly administered case 19-51212 (nak) |
||
Monday, June 14, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (awd) |
|
2 | 2
court
Entry
Mon 06/14 3:18 PM
Entry - See Bankruptcy Case No. 19-51200 (ECF No. 1668) for the Order which establishes procedures re filing fees, summons and orders for trial for this proceeding.(awd) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-05048 Complaint, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy, solely in her capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the Cambrian Liquidating Trust against The Cincinnati Mine Machinery Company Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Barber, T.) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |