Kennedy v. Estate of Roy Campbell
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Gregory R Schaaf |
Case #: | 5:21-ap-05051 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2021 |
Terminated: | Feb 28, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Estate of Roy Campbell
Judy Ison, Executrix PO Box 651
Hazard, KY 41701 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ellen Arvin Kennedy, Solely in her capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the Cambrian Liquidating Trust
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP 100 West Main Street Suite 900
Lexington, KY 40507 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, February 28, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 02/28 2:45 PM
Adversary Proceeding 21-5051 Closed. (rah) |
||
Friday, January 28, 2022 | ||
31 | 31
![]() Summary Judgment for Plaintiff on Counts I and IV of the Complaint. Counts II and III of Complaint are DISMISSED as moot. (gsc) |
|
30 | 30
![]() Memorandum Opinion (gsc) |
|
29 | 29
![]() Order OVERRULING Plaintiff's Cross-Motion to Strike Document . (lmu) |
|
Thursday, January 20, 2022 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Judge's Minutes of Hearing Held . (awd) |
|
27 | 27
![]() Judge's Minutes of Hearing Held . (awd) |
|
26 | 26
![]() PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/20/2022 9:45:23 AM ]. File Size [ 2982 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:12:26 ]. (admin) |
|
25 | 25
![]() Notice of Filing of Responses to Discovery Filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy.(Spires, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, January 19, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
court
Entry re Telephonic Hearing
Wed 01/19 12:03 PM
The Lexington hearings for Judge Schaaf on January 20, 2022, will be conducted via TELECONFERENCE at 9:00 a.m. Please refer to the Court's website:[LINK:www.kyeb.uscourts.gov/calendar] for telephonic call-in information . (rah) |
|
Thursday, January 13, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Response Filed by Estate of Roy Campbell . (Moore, Bradly) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, January 06, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Cross Motion to Strike Document, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy (awd) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
21 | 21
![]() Proposed Order submitted by John M. Spires on behalf of Ellen Arvin Kennedy . (Spires, John) |
|
20 | 20
![]() Response Filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy . (Spires, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
19 | 19
![]() Proposed Order submitted by Bradly E Moore on behalf of Estate of Roy Campbell . (Moore, Bradly) |
|
Tuesday, January 04, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Order Scheduling Hearing on Counter Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses opposing motion due by January 6, 2022; Replies by movant to such responses due by January 13, 2022. . Summary Judgment hearing scheduled for 1/20/2022 at 9:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (awd) |
|
17 | 17
epo
Deficiency re No Order Tendered
Tue 01/04 1:12 PM
Deficiency - Action Required The Court having reviewed the record and finding that no proposed order having been tendered with Counter Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No. 16 ] as required by KYEB LBR 9013-1(d), It is ORDERED that a proposed order shall be tendered within 3 working days from the date of this Order. If an order is not tendered, the Court may deny the requested relief [ECF No. 16 ]. /s/ Judge Gregory R. Schaaf. Document due 1/7/2022.(awd) |
|
Monday, January 03, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Counter Motion For Summary Judgment, filed by Estate of Roy Campbell (awd) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
15 | 15
![]() Response Filed by Estate of Roy Campbell . (Moore, Bradly) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Wednesday, December 01, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Order GRANTING Motion to Vacate Order for Trial, or in the Alternative, Extend Deadlines (awd) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Order Scheduling Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses opposing motion due by January 6, 2022; Replies by movant to such responses due by January 13, 2022. Summary Judgment Hearing scheduled for 1/20/2022 at 9:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (awd) |
|
Tuesday, November 30, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Motion to Vacate Order for Trial, or in the Alternative, Extend Deadlines, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy . (Spires, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
11 | 11
![]() Motion For Summary Judgment, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Spires, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Tuesday, November 23, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Response to Request for Admissions, filed by Estate of Roy Campbell. (Moore, Bradly) |
|
Wednesday, August 18, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Certificate of Service , filed by John M. Spires . (Spires, John) |
|
Tuesday, August 17, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Amended Answer to Complaint Filed by Estate of Roy Campbell . (Moore, Bradly) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
7 | 7
epo
File Statement re Consent
Tue 08/17 11:38 AM
Deficiency - Action Required Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7012(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, a responsive pleading shall include a statement that the party does or does not consent to entry of final orders or judgment by the bankruptcy court. It appearing to the Court that the Answer, [ECF No. 5 ], do(es) not contain such a statement, the Court hereby directs Bradly Moore to file a notice regarding consent within 7 days of the entry of this Order in conformity with the above-mentioned rule(s). /s/ Judge Gregory R. Schaaf. Date due: 8/24/2021.(awd) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Order for Trial. Trial date set for 1/11/2022 at 9:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (awd) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
Friday, August 13, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Answer to Complaint Filed by Estate of Roy Campbell . (Moore, Bradly) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, June 22, 2021 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 06/22 4:42 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-05051 grs] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 312987, amount $ 350.00 for Complaint (Doc#1701) filed in Lead Case 19-51200 Complaint applies to jointly administered case 19-51217 (nak) |
||
Wednesday, June 16, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Spires, John) |
|
Tuesday, June 15, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (awd) |
|
2 | 2
court
Entry
Tue 06/15 8:14 AM
Entry - See Bankruptcy Case No. 19-51200 (ECF No. 1668) for the Order which establishes procedures re filing fees, summons and orders for trial for this proceeding. (awd) |
|
Monday, June 14, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-05051 Complaint, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy against Estate of Roy Campbell Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Spires, John) |