Kennedy v. B & M Repair, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Gregory R Schaaf |
Case #: | 5:21-ap-05065 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2021 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
B & M Repair, Inc.
PO Box 4546
Chapmanville, WV 25508 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ellen Arvin Kennedy, , solely in her capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the Cambrian Liquidating Trust
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP 100 West Main Street Suite 900
Lexington, KY 40507 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, April 25, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 04/25 9:15 AM
Adversary Proceeding 21-5065 Closed. (rah) |
||
Friday, April 08, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (awd) |
|
20 | 20
![]() Proposed Order submitted by John M. Spires on behalf of B & M Repair, Inc., Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Spires, John) |
|
Wednesday, January 05, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Notice of Filing of Settlement Agreement Filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy.(Spires, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, December 15, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Order for Settlement Documents. Settlement Documents due: 1/5/2022 . (awd) |
|
Tuesday, December 14, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Joint Notice of Settlement in Principle Filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Spires, John) Modified on 12/15/2021. (awd) |
|
Thursday, December 02, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Order Striking Document (awd) |
|
Monday, November 15, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
epo
Deficiency re Signature
Mon 11/15 11:06 AM
Deficiency - Action Required The Court having reviewed the Certificate of Service [ECF No. 14 ] and finding that the pleading does not meet the requirements as set forth by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9011(a) and/or Section VI of the [LINK:Administrative Procedures Manual] , specifically, Signature block of counsel does not provide all relevant contact information. It is ORDERED that said pleading may be STRICKEN from the record unless the deficiency is corrected within 7 days from the entry of this Order. /s/ Judge Gregory R. Schaaf Date due: 11/22/2021.(awd) |
|
Friday, November 05, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Certificate of Service DEFENDANT B&M REPAIR, INC.S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS, INTERROGATORIES, AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF , filed by John Howard Zickefoose. (Zickefoose, John) |
|
Friday, September 24, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Notice of Statement Regarding Consent Filed by B & M Repair, Inc.. (Zickefoose, John) |
|
12 | 12
epo
File Statement re Consent
Fri 09/24 12:46 PM
Deficiency - Action Required Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7012(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, a responsive pleading shall include a statement that the party does or does not consent to entry of final orders or judgment by the bankruptcy court. It appearing to the Court that the Notice of Statement re Consent [ECF No. 11 ], does not contain a sufficient statement, the Court hereby directs John Zickefoose to file an amended notice regarding consent within 7 days of the entry of this Order in conformity with the above-mentioned rule(s). /s/ Judge Gregory R. Schaaf. Date due: 10/1/2021.(awd) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Notice of Statement Regarding Consent Filed by B & M Repair, Inc.. (Zickefoose, John) |
|
Friday, September 17, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Certificate of Service , filed by John M. Spires . (Spires, John) |
|
Thursday, September 16, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Order for Trial Trial date set for 1/25/2022 at 9:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (awd) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
8 | 8
epo
File Statement re Consent
Thu 09/16 8:49 AM
Deficiency - Action Required Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7012(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, a responsive pleading shall include a statement that the party does or does not consent to entry of final orders or judgment by the bankruptcy court. It appearing to the Court that the Answer, [ECF No. 7 ], do(es) not contain such a statement, the Court hereby directs John Zickefoose to file a notice regarding consent within 7 days of the entry of this Order in conformity with the above-mentioned rule(s). /s/ Judge Gregory R. Schaaf. Date due: 9/23/2021.(awd) |
|
utility
Jury Demand
Thu 09/16 8:46 AM
Jury Demand by B & M Repair, Inc.. (awd) |
||
Wednesday, September 15, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Answer to Complaint to Avoid Transfers and to Recover Property Filed by B & M Repair, Inc. . (Zickefoose, John) |
|
Saturday, August 14, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order GRANTING Motion to Extend Time to Answer or otherwise Respond (awd) |
|
Friday, August 13, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Motion to Extend Time in Which the Defendant May Answer or Otherwise Respond, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy . (Spires, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, June 22, 2021 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 06/22 5:01 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-05065 grs] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 313005, amount $ 350.00 for Complaint (Doc#1715) filed in Lead Case 19-51200 Complaint applies to jointly administered case 19-51217 (nak) |
||
Wednesday, June 16, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Spires, John) |
|
Tuesday, June 15, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (awd) |
|
2 | 2
court
Entry
Tue 06/15 10:11 AM
Entry - See Bankruptcy Case No. 19-51200 (ECF No. 1668) for the Order which establishes procedures re filing fees, summons and orders for trial for this proceeding. (awd) |
|
Monday, June 14, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-05065 Complaint, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy against B & M Repair, Inc. Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Spires, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |