Kennedy v. Prudential Insurance Company of America
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Gregory R Schaaf |
Case #: | 5:21-ap-05070 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2021 |
Terminated: | Sep 03, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Prudential Insurance Company of America
100 Mulberry Street Gateway 3, 7th Floor
Newark, NJ 07102 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ellen Arvin Kennedy, Solely in her capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the Cambrian Liquidating Trust
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP 100 West Main Street Suite 900
Lexington, KY 40507 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, September 03, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 09/03 11:16 AM
Adversary Proceeding 21-5070 Closed. (rah) |
||
Friday, August 13, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Notice of Dismissal Filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Spires, John) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Order GRANTING Motion to Extend Time to Answer or otherwise Respond (awd) |
|
Thursday, August 12, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Motion to Extend Time in Which the Defendant May Answer or Otherwise Respond, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Spires, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, June 22, 2021 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 06/22 5:08 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-05070 grs] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 313010, amount $ 350.00 for Complaint (Doc#1720) filed in Lead Case 19-51200 Complaint applies to jointly administered case 19-51210 (nak) |
||
Wednesday, June 16, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Spires, John) |
|
Tuesday, June 15, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (awd) |
|
2 | 2
court
Entry
Tue 06/15 11:06 AM
Entry - See Bankruptcy Case No. 19-51200 (ECF No. 1668) for the Order which establishes procedures re filing fees, summons and orders for trial for this proceeding. (awd) |
|
Monday, June 14, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-05070 Complaint, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy against Prudential Insurance Company of America Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Spires, John) |