Kennedy v. Western Commerce Bank
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Gregory R Schaaf |
Case #: | 5:21-ap-05076 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2021 |
Terminated: | Apr 20, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Western Commerce Bank
127 S. Canyon Street
Carlsbad, NM 88220 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ellen Arvin Kennedy, Solely in her capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the Cambrian Liquidating Trust
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP 100 West Main Street Suite 900
Lexington, KY 40507 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 20, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 04/20 9:34 AM
Adversary Proceeding 21-5076 Closed. (rah) |
||
Tuesday, March 22, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (awd) |
|
Monday, March 21, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Proposed Order submitted by John M. Spires on behalf of Ellen Arvin Kennedy, Western Commerce Bank. (Spires, John) |
|
Tuesday, January 11, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Ninth Agreed Order Extending Time to Answer. (awd) |
|
Friday, January 07, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Proposed Order submitted by John M. Spires on behalf of Ellen Arvin Kennedy, Western Commerce Bank. (Spires, John) |
|
Monday, December 20, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Eighth Agreed Order Extending Time in Which to Answer. (alf) |
|
Friday, December 17, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Proposed Order submitted by John M. Spires on behalf of Ellen Arvin Kennedy, Western Commerce Bank. (Spires, John) |
|
Monday, December 06, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Seventh Agreed Order Extending Time to Answer. (awd) |
|
Friday, December 03, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Proposed Order submitted by John M. Spires on behalf of Ellen Arvin Kennedy, Western Commerce Bank. (Spires, John) |
|
Wednesday, November 10, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Sixth Agreed Order Extending Time in Which the Defendant may Answer or Otherwise Respond. (alf) |
|
Tuesday, November 09, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Proposed Order submitted by John M. Spires on behalf of Ellen Arvin Kennedy, Western Commerce Bank. (Spires, John) |
|
Wednesday, October 27, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Fifth Agreed Order Extending Time to Answer (awd) |
|
Tuesday, October 26, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Proposed Order submitted by John M. Spires on behalf of Ellen Arvin Kennedy, Western Commerce Bank. (Spires, John) |
|
Tuesday, October 05, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Fourth Agreed Order Extending Time to Answer. (bjp) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Proposed Order submitted by John M. Spires on behalf of Ellen Arvin Kennedy, Western Commerce Bank. (Spires, John) |
|
Wednesday, September 22, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Third Agreed Order Extending Time to Answer. (awd) |
|
Tuesday, September 21, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Proposed Order submitted by John M. Spires on behalf of Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Spires, John) |
|
Wednesday, September 08, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Second Agreed Order Extending Time for Defendant to Answer (awd) |
|
Tuesday, September 07, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Proposed Order submitted by John M. Spires on behalf of Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Spires, John) |
|
Tuesday, August 17, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Agreed Order Extending Answer Deadline. (awd) |
|
Monday, August 16, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Proposed Order submitted by John M. Spires on behalf of Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Spires, John) |
|
Friday, August 13, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Peter M. Gannott Filed by on behalf of Western Commerce Bank. (Gannott, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, June 22, 2021 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 06/22 5:16 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-05076 grs] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 313016, amount $ 350.00 for Complaint (Doc#1726) filed in Lead Case 19-51200 Complaint applies to jointly administered case 19-51216 (nak) |
||
Friday, June 18, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Spires, John) |
|
Tuesday, June 15, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (awd) |
|
2 | 2
court
Entry
Tue 06/15 11:31 AM
Entry - See Bankruptcy Case No. 19-51200 (ECF No. 1668) for the Order which establishes procedures re filing fees, summons and orders for trial for this proceeding. (awd) |
|
Monday, June 14, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-05076 Complaint, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy against Western Commerce Bank Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Spires, John) |