Kennedy v. Locust Grove, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Gregory R Schaaf |
Case #: | 5:21-ap-05078 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jan 28, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Locust Grove, Inc.
100 Cooksey Street PO Box 958
Hazard, KY 41702 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ellen Arvin Kennedy, , solely in her capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the Cambrian Liquidating Trust
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP 100 West Main Street Suite 900
Lexington, KY 40507 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, January 28, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 01/28 1:39 PM
Adversary Proceeding 21-5078 Closed. (rah) |
||
Tuesday, January 11, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (awd) |
|
22 | 22
![]() Proposed Order submitted by John M. Spires on behalf of Ellen Arvin Kennedy, Locust Grove, Inc.. (Spires, John) |
|
Thursday, December 16, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Order for Settlement Documents. Settlement Documents due: 1/6/2022 . (awd) |
|
20 | 20
![]() Order Remanding Order and Striking Hearing (awd) |
|
utility
Terminate Deadline or Hearing (public)
Thu 12/16 8:23 AM
HEARING TERMINATED. The hearing scheduled for December 16, 2021 on Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No.12 ] has been removed from the docket. Joint Notice of Settlement filed . (awd) |
||
Wednesday, December 15, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Joint Notice of Settlement in Principle Filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Spires, John) Modified on 12/16/2021. (awd) |
|
Thursday, December 02, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Response Filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy . (Gray, Spencer) |
|
Wednesday, November 24, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Response Filed by Locust Grove, Inc. . (Medaris, Frank) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
Monday, November 15, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Order GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion To Vacate Order, or in the Alternative, Continue Trial and Deadlines . (lmu) |
|
Friday, November 12, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Motion to Vacate Order, or in the Alternative, Continue Trial and Deadlines, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (lmu) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
14 | 14
![]() Order Scheduling Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses opposing motion due by November 24, 2021; Replies by movant to such responses due by December 2, 2021 . Summary Judgment Hearing scheduled for 12/16/2021 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (lmu) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Motion to Vacate Order for Trial, or in the Alternative, Extend Deadlines, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Spires, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, November 09, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Motion For Summary Judgment, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Gray, Spencer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Tuesday, October 19, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Certificate of Service , filed by John M. Spires . (Spires, John) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Order Rescheduling Trial Date. Trial date rescheduled for 1/11/2022 at 9:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (awd) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
Monday, August 16, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Amended Answer , filed by Locust Grove, Inc. . (Medaris, Frank) |
|
Friday, August 13, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Certificate of Service , filed by John M. Spires . (Spires, John) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Order for Trial. Trial date set for 12/21/2021 at 9:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (awd) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
Wednesday, August 11, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
epo
File Statement re Consent
Wed 08/11 3:54 PM
Deficiency - Action Required Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7012(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, a responsive pleading shall include a statement that the party does or does not consent to entry of final orders or judgment by the bankruptcy court. It appearing to the Court that the Answer, [ECF No. 5 ], do(es) not contain a sufficient statement, the Court hereby directs Frank Medaris to file a notice regarding consent within 7 days of the entry of this Order in conformity with the above-mentioned rule(s). /s/ Judge Gregory R. Schaaf. Date due: 8/18/2021.(awd) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Answer to Complaint Filed by Locust Grove, Inc. . (Medaris, Frank) |
|
Tuesday, June 22, 2021 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 06/22 5:17 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-05078 grs] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 313019, amount $ 350.00 for Complaint (Doc#1728) in Lead Case 19-51200 Complaint applies to jointly administered case 19-51217 (nak) |
||
Wednesday, June 16, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Spires, John) |
|
Tuesday, June 15, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (awd) |
|
2 | 2
court
Entry
Tue 06/15 11:42 AM
Entry - See Bankruptcy Case No. 19-51200 (ECF No. 1668) for the Order which establishes procedures re filing fees, summons and orders for trial for this proceeding. (awd) |
|
Monday, June 14, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-05078 Complaint, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy against Locust Grove, Inc. Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Spires, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |