Jordan v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:21-cv-81055 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 16, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Mississippi Southern, 3:21-cv-00358 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 11, 2021 3:40 AM EST |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Glaxosmithkline LLC
|
|
Defendant
Inc Pfizer
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Terry L. Jordan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 16, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
order
Administrative Order
Wed 06/16 3:51 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Monday, June 14, 2021 | ||
10 | 10 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of Mississippi. Case Number 3:21-cv-00358 with documents 1-7. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81055-RLR Jordan v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al on 6/14/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) | |
9 | 9 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) | |
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Mon 06/14 1:09 PM
Case transferred in from Mississippi Southern; Case Number 3:21-cv-00358. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 06/14 1:11 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
||
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Mon 06/14 1:19 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of Mississippi. Case Number 3:21-cv-00358 with documents 1-7. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81055-RLR Jordan v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al on 6/14/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) |
||
Monday, June 07, 2021 | ||
7 | 7 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: transferring this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida.(PG) | |
Att: 1 Cover Letter | ||
6 | 6 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-65) Transferring case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. (PG) | |
Friday, June 04, 2021 | ||
5 | 5 Letter sent to MDL Clerk with docket entries and notice of removal. (PG) | |
Friday, May 28, 2021 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER granting3 Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/28/2021. (dcw) | |
NOTICE: Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/10/2021 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (dcw) | ||
Thursday, May 27, 2021 | ||
3 | 3 Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Spicer, Adam) | |
Friday, May 21, 2021 | ||
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Spicer, Adam) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. from Neshoba County Circuit Court, case number 21-cv-94-NS-CM. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4560279) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (PG) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - State Court Filings |