Kanaga v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-01776 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 11, 2021 4:05 AM EST |
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
individually and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Steve Kanaga
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, June 14, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 06/14 3:03 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Kanaga v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-1776-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern Washington (sshe, ) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/14 3:02 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/14 3:01 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9901830.), filed by Steve Kanaga. Service due by 9/13/2021(sshe, ) |