Diversified Midstream LLC v. Pristine Clean Energy LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Gregory R Schaaf |
Case #: | 5:21-ap-05091 |
Nature of Suit | 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 22, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Pristine Clean Energy LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Virgie Clean Mining, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diversified Midstream LLC
|
Represented By
|
![]() Memorandum Opinion Granting Summary Judgment (RE: related document(s)17 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Diversified Midstream LLC) (awd) |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 22, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 12/22 8:08 AM
Adversary Proceeding 21-5091 Closed. (rah) |
||
Monday, November 15, 2021 | ||
30 | 30
![]() Order GRANTING Motion of Mark L. Esposito to Appear pro hac vice Payment Due: 11/29/2021. (awd) |
|
29 | 29
![]() Summary Judgment for Plaintiff Diversified Midstream LLC. (awd) |
|
28 | 28
![]() Memorandum Opinion Granting Summary Judgment (awd) |
|
Friday, November 12, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Proposed Order submitted by Timothy K. Lowe on behalf of Diversified Midstream LLC . (Lowe, Timothy) |
|
26 | 26
![]() Motion to Appear pro hac vice,filed by Diversified Midstream LLC. (Lowe, Timothy) |
|
Tuesday, November 09, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Status Report, filed by Diversified Midstream LLC. (Lowe, Timothy) |
|
24 | 24
![]() Notice of Uncontested Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Diversified Midstream LLC. (Lowe, Timothy) |
|
23 | 23
![]() Exhibit list filed by Diversified Midstream LLC. (Lowe, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Thursday, October 28, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Proposed Order submitted by Timothy K. Lowe on behalf of Diversified Midstream LLC . (Lowe, Timothy) |
|
Wednesday, October 27, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
epo
Deficiency re No Order Tendered
Wed 10/27 8:44 AM
Deficiency - Action Required The Court having reviewed the record and finding that no proposed order having been tendered with the Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No. 17 ] as required by KYEB LBR 9013-1(d), It is ORDERED that a proposed order shall be tendered within 3 working days from the date of this Order. If an order is not tendered, the Court may deny the requested relief [ECF No. 17 ]. /s/ Judge Gregory R. Schaaf. Document due by 11/1/2021.(awd) |
|
Tuesday, October 26, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Order Scheduling Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses opposing motion due by November 4, 2021; Replies by movant to such responses due by November 11, 2021. Summary Judgment Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2021 at 9:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (awd) |
|
19 | 19
![]() Affidavit of Eric Conley filed by Diversified Midstream LLC . (Lowe, Timothy) |
|
18 | 18
![]() Memorandum Supporting Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Diversified Midstream LLC . (Lowe, Timothy) |
|
17 | 17
![]() Motion For Summary Judgment, filed by Diversified Midstream LLC. (Lowe, Timothy) |
|
Friday, October 08, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Notice of Service of Discovery to Defendants Filed by Diversified Midstream LLC. (Lowe, Timothy) |
|
Tuesday, July 20, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Corporate Ownership Statement, filed by Pristine Clean Energy LLC, Virgie Clean Mining, LLC.. (Shelton, Billy) |
|
14 | 14
![]() Answer to Complaint Filed by Pristine Clean Energy LLC, Virgie Clean Mining, LLC . (Shelton, Billy) |
|
Tuesday, June 29, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Corporate Ownership Statement, filed by Diversified Midstream LLC.. (Lowe, Timothy) |
|
Thursday, June 24, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Lowe, Timothy) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Lowe, Timothy) |
|
Wednesday, June 23, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
epo
Deficiency re Signature
Wed 06/23 7:58 AM
Deficiency - Action Required The Court having reviewed the Summons Service Executed [ECF Nos. [6 and 7]] and finding that the pleading does not meet the requirements as set forth by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9011(a) and/or Section VI of the [LINK:Administrative Procedures Manual] , specifically, Documents do not contain a signature. It is ORDERED that said pleadings may be STRICKEN from the record unless the deficiency is corrected within 7 days from the entry of this Order. /s/ Judge Gregory R. Schaaf Date due: 6/30/2021.(kay) |
|
Tuesday, June 22, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Affidavit of Timothy K. Lowe filed by Diversified Midstream LLC . (Lowe, Timothy) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Notice of of Plaintiff's Consent to Entry of Order by this Bankruptcy Court Filed by Diversified Midstream LLC. (Lowe, Timothy) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Summons Service Executed.. (Lowe, Timothy) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Summons Service Executed.. (Lowe, Timothy) |
|
Saturday, June 19, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Order for Trial. Trial date set for 12/7/2021 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (alf) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
Thursday, June 17, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (awd) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Order to Pay Filing Fee. . Filing Fee due by 6/22/2021. (awd) |
|
Tuesday, June 15, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
epo
File Statement re Consent
Tue 06/15 1:24 PM
Deficiency - Action Required Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 7008 and 9027(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, a complaint, counterclaim, cross-claim, third-party complaint and notice of removal shall contain a statement that the party does or does not consent to entry of final orders or judgment by the bankruptcy court. It appearing to the Court that the Complaint, [ECF No. 1 ], do(es) not contain such a statement, the Court hereby directs Timothy K. Lowe to file a notice regarding consent within 7 days of the entry of this Order in conformity with the above-mentioned rule(s). /s/ Judge Gregory R. Schaaf. Date due: 6/22/2021.(awd) |
|
Monday, June 14, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-05091 Complaint, filed by Diversified Midstream LLC against Pristine Clean Energy LLC, Virgie Clean Mining, LLC Fee Amount 350. (91 (Declaratory judgment)) (Lowe, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |