Kennedy v. Dhiyohouse Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Gregory R Schaaf |
Case #: | 5:21-ap-05113 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2021 |
Terminated: | Sep 10, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Dhiyohouse Inc.
10285 Hwy 550 West
Emmalena, KY 41740 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ellen Arvin Kennedy, , solely in her capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the Cambrian Liquidating Trust
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP 100 West Main Street Suite 900
Lexington, KY 40507 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, September 10, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 09/10 8:55 AM
Adversary Proceeding 21-5113 Closed. (rah) |
||
Tuesday, September 07, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Notice of Dismissal Filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Spires, John) |
|
Friday, August 13, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order GRANTING Motion to Extend Time to Answer or otherwise Respond (awd) |
|
Thursday, August 12, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Motion to Extend Time in Which the Defendant May Answer or Otherwise Respond, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy . (Spires, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, June 22, 2021 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 06/22 6:00 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-05113 grs] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 313062, amount $ 350.00. (nak) |
||
Wednesday, June 16, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Spires, John) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (awd) |
|
2 | 2
court
Entry
Wed 06/16 10:16 AM
Entry - See Bankruptcy Case No. 19-51200 (ECF No. 1668) for the Order which establishes procedures re filing fees, summons and orders for trial for this proceeding. (awd) |
|
Monday, June 14, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-05113 Complaint, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy against Dhiyohouse Inc. Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Spires, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |