Goodman v. United Central Industrial Supply Company, L.L.C.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Gregory R Schaaf |
Case #: | 5:21-ap-05136 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jan 31, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
United Central Industrial Supply Company, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Geoffrey S. Goodman, , solely in his capacity as Designee of the Cambrian Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, January 31, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 01/31 12:33 PM
Adversary Proceeding 21-5136 Closed. (rah) |
||
Tuesday, January 25, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Notice of Dismissal Filed by Geoffrey S. Goodman. (Barber, T.) |
|
Wednesday, December 15, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Clerk's Entry of Default, United Central Industrial Supply Company, L.L.C. (rah) |
|
Tuesday, December 14, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Request for Clerk's Entry of Default. (Barber, T.) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, December 13, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Report of No Action by the Clerk . (rah) |
|
Thursday, December 09, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Request for Clerk's Entry of Default. (Barber, T.) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, December 02, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Order to File a Status Report or take other action to advance this proceeding. Document due by 12/16/2021. (awd) |
|
Monday, November 15, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Barber, T.) |
|
Tuesday, June 22, 2021 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 06/22 7:26 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-05136 grs] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 313095, amount $ 350.00. (nak) |
||
Wednesday, June 16, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (awd) |
|
2 | 2
court
Entry
Wed 06/16 1:05 PM
Entry - See Bankruptcy Case No. 19-51200 (ECF No. 1668) for the Order which establishes procedures re filing fees, summons and orders for trial for this proceeding. (awd) |
|
Tuesday, June 15, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-05136 Complaint, filed by Geoffrey S. Goodman against United Central Industrial Supply Company, L.L.C. Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Barber, T.) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |