Kennedy v. Thompson Electric Motor Service, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Gregory R Schaaf |
Case #: | 5:21-ap-05143 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2021 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Thompson Electric Motor Service, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ellen Arvin Kennedy, , solely in her capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the Cambrian Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 22, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 03/22 10:05 AM
Adversary Proceeding 21-5143 Closed. (rah) |
||
Thursday, March 10, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Notice of Dismissal Filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Barber, T.) |
|
Friday, March 04, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Status Report, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Barber, T.) |
|
Friday, February 18, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Status Report, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Barber, T.) |
|
Friday, February 04, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Status Report, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Barber, T.) |
|
Friday, January 21, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Status Report, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Barber, T.) |
|
Friday, January 07, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Status Report, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Barber, T.) |
|
Friday, December 17, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Order for Settlement Documents. Settlement Documents due: 1/7/2022 . (awd) |
|
Thursday, December 16, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Status Report, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Barber, T.) |
|
Thursday, December 02, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Order to File a Status Report or take other action to advance this proceeding. Document due by 12/16/2021. (awd) |
|
Monday, November 15, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Barber, T.) |
|
Friday, September 10, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Receipt Information from District Court . (awd) |
|
Thursday, September 09, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
court
Court's Certificate of Mailing
Thu 09/09 2:54 PM
Court's Certificate of Mailing: Document mailed on September 9, 2021, to USDC at 101 Barr St., Lexington, KY, 40507 . (awd) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Order GRANTING Motion for Robert B. Kuenzel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (awd) |
|
Wednesday, September 08, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
court
Entry re Original Pleading
Wed 09/08 2:13 PM
An amended/corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice [ECF No.8 ] having been filed, parties are hereby notified that based upon the submission of the amended/corrected pleading, the original Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice [ECF No.4 ] will be deemed withdrawn unless an objection is filed within 3 working days from the date of this entry. (awd) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Motion Renewed Motion for Admission Pro Hoc Vice, filed by Thompson Electric Motor Service, Inc.. (Kuenzel, Robert) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, September 03, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
epo
Deficiency re Caption
Fri 09/03 6:49 AM
Deficiency - Action Required The Court having considered the Supplemental Document [ECF No. 6 ] and finding that the pleading does not meet the requirements as set forth by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9004(b). It is ORDERED that said pleading may be STRICKEN from the record unless submitted with a proper case caption within 7 days from the entry of this Order. /s/ Judge Gregory R. Schaaf Date due: 9/10/2021.(alf) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Supplemental Document Certificate of Good Standing , filed by Thompson Electric Motor Service, Inc. . (Kuenzel, Robert) |
|
Thursday, August 26, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Order to File Certificate of Good Standing . Document due by 9/2/2021. (alf) |
|
Wednesday, August 25, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Motion to Appear pro hac vice,filed by Robert Kuenzel, attorney for Thompson Electric Motor Service, Inc. (alf) |
|
Tuesday, June 22, 2021 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 06/22 7:38 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-05143 grs] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 313104, amount $ 350.00. (nak) |
||
Wednesday, June 16, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (awd) |
|
2 | 2
court
Entry
Wed 06/16 2:55 PM
Entry - See Bankruptcy Case No. 19-51200 (ECF No. 1668) for the Order which establishes procedures re filing fees, summons and orders for trial for this proceeding. (awd) |
|
Tuesday, June 15, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-05143 Complaint, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy against Thompson Electric Motor Service, Inc. Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Barber, T.) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |