Kennedy v. KP Trucking, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Gregory R Schaaf |
Case #: | 5:21-ap-05146 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2021 |
Terminated: | Oct 22, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
KP Trucking, LLC
337 Right Fork Greasy
Shelbiana, KY 41562 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ellen Arvin Kennedy, , solely in her capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the Cambrian Liquidating Trust
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP 100 West Main Street Suite 900
Lexington, KY 40507 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, October 22, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 10/22 3:48 PM
Adversary Proceeding 21-5146 Closed. (rah) |
||
Thursday, October 07, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Agreed Order of Dismissal (awd) |
|
Wednesday, October 06, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Proposed Order submitted by John M. Spires on behalf of KP Trucking, LLC, Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Spires, John) |
|
Monday, August 16, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Certificate of Service of Agreed Order Extending Answer Deadline , filed by Stephen Barnes . (Barnes, Stephen) |
|
Friday, August 13, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Agreed Order Extending Answer Deadline. (awd) |
|
Thursday, August 12, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Proposed Order submitted by Stephen Barnes on behalf of KP Trucking, LLC. (Barnes, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, August 11, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Stephen Barnes Filed by on behalf of KP Trucking, LLC. (Barnes, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, June 22, 2021 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 06/22 7:35 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-05146 grs] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 313110, amount $ 350.00. (nak) |
||
Friday, June 18, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Spires, John) |
|
Wednesday, June 16, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (awd) |
|
2 | 2
court
Entry
Wed 06/16 3:05 PM
Entry - See Bankruptcy Case No. 19-51200 (ECF No. 1668) for the Order which establishes procedures re filing fees, summons and orders for trial for this proceeding. (awd) |
|
Tuesday, June 15, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-05146 Complaint, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy against KP Trucking, LLC Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Spires, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |