Kennedy v. Stone & Saunders LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Gregory R Schaaf |
Case #: | 5:21-ap-05148 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2021 |
Terminated: | Oct 12, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Stone & Saunders LLC
Legalinc Corporate Services Inc. 1991 Crocker Rd, Suite 600A
Westlake, OH 44145 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ellen Arvin Kennedy, Solely in her capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the Cambrian Liquidating Trust
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP 100 West Main Street Suite 900
Lexington, KY 40507 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, November 21, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Correspondence re: Exemplification of Judgment. Exemplified copies mailed on November 21, 2022. (awd) |
|
Tuesday, November 09, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Service Filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Spires, John) |
|
Tuesday, October 12, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 10/12 2:20 PM
Adversary Proceeding 21-5148 Closed. (rah) |
||
Wednesday, September 22, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Order GRANTING Motion For Default Judgment against Dft Stone & Saunders LLC (awd) |
|
Friday, September 03, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Application for Default Judgment against Stone & Saunders LLC, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy. Last day to file objections: 9/17/2021 . (Spires, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Wednesday, August 25, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Clerk's Entry of Default, Stone & Saunders LLC. (rah) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Request for Clerk's Entry of Default. (Spires, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, June 22, 2021 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 06/22 7:36 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-05148 grs] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 313112, amount $ 350.00. (nak) |
||
Friday, June 18, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Spires, John) |
|
Wednesday, June 16, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (awd) |
|
2 | 2
court
Entry
Wed 06/16 3:10 PM
Entry - See Bankruptcy Case No. 19-51200 (ECF No. 1668) for the Order which establishes procedures re filing fees, summons and orders for trial for this proceeding. (awd) |
|
Tuesday, June 15, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-05148 Complaint, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy against Stone & Saunders LLC Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Spires, John) |