Sledge v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:21-cv-81073 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 16, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Mississippi Northern, 4:21-cv-00070 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 12, 2021 4:38 AM EST |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Glaxosmithkline LLC
|
|
Defendant
Inc Pfizer
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Alinda C. Sledge
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 16, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
order
Administrative Order
Wed 06/16 3:51 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Tuesday, June 15, 2021 | ||
11 | 11 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of Mississippi. Case Number 4:21-cv-00070 with documents 1-8. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81073-RLR Sledge v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al on 6/15/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) | |
10 | 10 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) | |
9 | 9
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Tue 06/15 3:00 PM
Case transferred in from Mississippi Northern; Case Number 4:21-cv-00070. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Tue 06/15 3:02 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
||
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Tue 06/15 3:43 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of Mississippi. Case Number 4:21-cv-00070 with documents 1-8. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81073-RLR Sledge v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al on 6/15/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) |
||
Monday, June 14, 2021 | ||
8 | 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to USDC, Southern District of Florida. Case Transferred to District of Southern Florida via ECF. CASE CLOSED. (jla) | |
Monday, June 07, 2021 | ||
7 | 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur F. Jernigan, Jr on behalf of Alinda C. Sledge Sanofi US Services Inc. served on 6/4/2021. (Jernigan, Arthur) | |
6 | 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur F. Jernigan, Jr on behalf of Alinda C. Sledge Chattem, Inc. served on 6/4/2021. (Jernigan, Arthur) | |
Thursday, May 27, 2021 | ||
5 | 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur F. Jernigan, Jr on behalf of Alinda C. Sledge Pfizer, Inc. served on 5/27/2021. (Jernigan, Arthur) | |
4 | 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur F. Jernigan, Jr on behalf of Alinda C. Sledge Glaxosmithkline, LLC served on 5/27/2021. (Jernigan, Arthur) | |
3 | 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur F. Jernigan, Jr on behalf of Alinda C. Sledge Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 5/27/2021. (Jernigan, Arthur) | |
Wednesday, May 26, 2021 | ||
2 | 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr) | |
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla) | ||
Tuesday, May 25, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1951895, filed by Alinda C. Sledge. (jla) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |