Waibel v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-01821 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 13, 2021 4:38 AM EST |
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Coporation Trust Company 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Sandra Waibel
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 08/22 8:56 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs of certain claimsAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Feliciani, Joseph) Modified to edit docket text for clarification on 8/22/2024 (sshe, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, June 16, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 06/16 4:39 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Waibel v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-1821-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern Pennsylvania (sshe, ) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/16 4:38 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/16 4:38 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9908704.), filed by Sandra Waibel. Service due by 9/14/2021(sshe, ) |