Konopka v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-01828 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 13, 2021 4:23 AM EST |
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Coporation Trust Company 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Ken Mikhail Konopka
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/20 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PlaintiffsAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Feliciani, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, July 21, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Status Report
Wed 07/21 12:41 PM
STATUS REPORT - Defendant BASF Corporation's General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corp, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, June 16, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 06/16 4:43 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Konopka v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-1828-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern Pennsylvania (sshe, ) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/16 4:43 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/16 4:42 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9909507.), filed by Ken Mikhail Konopka. Service due by 9/14/2021(sshe, ) |