Hernandez-Alejandro v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:21-cv-81086 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 17, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 23, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Puerto Rico, 3:21-cv-01181 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 14, 2021 3:52 AM EST |
Defendant
PAI Holdings, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SANOFI S.A
|
|
Defendant
Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc.
9431 Florida Mining Boulevard East
Jacksonville, FL 32257 |
|
Defendant
Ranbaxy Inc
|
|
Defendant
Precision Dose, Inc.
722 Progressive Lane S
Beloit, IL 61080 |
|
Defendant
Pharmaceutical Associates, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Pharma USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer Inc
|
|
Defendant
Perrigo Research & Development Company
|
|
Defendant
Perrigo Company PLC
|
|
Defendant
Perrigo Company
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.,
|
|
Defendant
Novitium Pharma LLC
|
|
Defendant
Nostrum Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Northwind Pharmaceuticals
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Laboratories Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Institutional LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Methapharm, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Lannett Co, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
L. Perrigo Co.
|
|
Defendant
VKT Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Zydus-Cadila
|
|
Defendant
Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wockhardt USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wockhardt USA LLC
|
|
Defendant
Wockhardt Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals International Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Co.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
VKT Pharma Private Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
J B Chemicals and Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Unique Pharmaceutical Laboratories Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Torrent Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Inc
|
|
Defendant
Strides Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Strides Pharma Science Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Strides Pharma Global Pte. Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U. S. LLC
|
|
Defendant
Anda Repository, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cadila Healthcare Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim U.S.A. Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V.
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Aurobindo Pharma, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Auro Health LLC
|
|
Defendant
Appco Pharma LLC
|
|
Defendant
Apotex Inc
|
|
Defendant
Apotex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Ani Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amerisource Health Services, LLC d/b/a American Health Packaging
2550 John Glenn Ave. Suite A
Columbus, OH 43217 |
|
Defendant
Amerisource Bergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
American Health Packaging
|
|
Defendant
Ajanta Pharma USA Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ajanta Pharma Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Acic Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline P.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals International, Ltd. f/k/a West-Ward Pharmaceuticals International, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Hi-Tech Pharmacal Co., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Heritage Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Heritage Pharma Labs Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Granules USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Granules India, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Golden State Medical Supply, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Glenmark Generics Ltd
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Geri-Care Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Emcure Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Duane Reade, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Reddy's Laboratories SA
|
|
Defendant
Denton Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Contract Pharmacal Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Victor Hernandez-Alejandro
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 23, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 06/23 9:40 AM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (pes) |
|
Thursday, June 17, 2021 | ||
12 | 12 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Puerto Rico. Case Number 3:21-cv-01181 with documents 1-9. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81086-RLR Hernandez-Alejandro v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al on 6/17/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) | |
11 | 11 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) | |
10 | 10
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Thu 06/17 2:48 PM
Case transferred in from Puerto Rico; Case Number 3:21-cv-01181. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc). |
|
Monday, June 07, 2021 | ||
9 | 9 TRANSMITTAL Letter from the Southern District of Florida, transferee court, with certified copy of CTO-65 in MDL 2924 and List of Tag-Along Actions. Their case number for this case is 20-md-02924 RLR. The Presiding Judge is Hon. Robin L. Rosenberg. This case is hereby closed. (idg) | |
Att: 1 Certified CTO, | ||
Att: 2 List of Tag-Along Actions | ||
8 | 8 E-MAIL NOTIFICATION from the MDL: Minute Order to all involved clerks informing that a transfer of this case to the Southern District of Florida shall be effective when we receive a certified copy of the Transfer Order from the transferee court. (ab) | |
7 | 7 E-MAIL NOTIFICATION RE: MDL No. 2924, informing that this case forms part of CTO-65 for transfer to the Southern District of Florida and that the stay has been lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 6/7/2021. (ab) (ab). | |
Att: 1 (6/7/2021) CTO-65, | ||
Att: 2 (6/7/2021) Tag Along Actions | ||
Wednesday, May 05, 2021 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER re2 Motion to Amend/Correct: GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 05/05/2021. (brc) | |
5 | 5 ORDER re3 Motion to transfer case: NOTED. Counsel shall inform the Court if the Conditional Transfer Request (docket no.3 ), was filed before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation at the Southern District of Florida. Once the MDL provides notice of the CTO, the case will be transferred as indicated by the MDL Panel. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 5/5/2021. (ab) | |
Tuesday, May 04, 2021 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg) | |
Monday, April 26, 2021 | ||
3 | 3 MOTION to transfer case filed by Eric M. Quetglas-Jordan on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/6/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) | |
Thursday, April 22, 2021 | ||
2 | 2 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Name filed by Eric M. Quetglas-Jordan on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/6/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7273248.), filed by Vctor Hernndez Alejandro. Service due by 7/21/2021,(Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Category Sheet |