Estate of Chandrakala Singh v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:21-cv-81088 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death |
Case Filed: | Jun 17, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 23, 2021 |
Case in other court: | New York Eastern, 2:21-cv-02963 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 14, 2021 3:53 AM EST |
Defendant
Boehringer Inhelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer Inc
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Estate of Chandrakala Singh
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 23, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 06/23 9:40 AM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (pes) |
|
Thursday, June 17, 2021 | ||
10 | 10 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of New York. Case Number 2:21-cv-02963 with documents 1-7. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81088-RLR Estate of Chandrakala Singh v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al on 6/17/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) | |
9 | 9 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) | |
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Thu 06/17 3:27 PM
Case transferred in from New York Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-02963. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Thu 06/17 3:29 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
||
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Thu 06/17 5:14 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of New York. Case Number 2:21-cv-02963 with documents 1-7. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81088-RLR Estate of Chandrakala Singh v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al on 6/17/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) |
||
Monday, June 14, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
order
MDL Conditional Transfer Order
Thu 06/17 12:19 PM
Certified JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 66): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to the Southern District of Florida for the reasons stated in the order of February 6, 2020, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. (Florio, Lisa) |
|
Friday, June 11, 2021 | ||
6 | 6 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 66): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to the Southern District of Florida for the reasons stated in the order of February 6, 2020, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. (Florio, Lisa) | |
Friday, May 28, 2021 | ||
5 | 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT Estate of Chandrakala Singh against Boehringer Inhelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Chattem Inc., Glaxosmithkline, LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., filed by Estate of Chandrakala Singh. (Dass, Anil) | |
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Plaintiff, a resident of New York, attempts to invoke this Court's diversity jurisdiction as the sole jurisdictional ground for the case. However, one of the defendants, Pfizer, is alleged in the complaint to have its principal place of business in New York, which is also reflected in caselaw. Montagnon v. Pfizer, Inc., No. 3:06 CV 280 CFD, 2006 WL 2349621, at *1 (D. Conn. July 10, 2006. Thus, the matter lacks complete diversity and must be dismissed without prejudice to refiling in state court. Where jurisdiction is lacking,... dismissal is mandatory. Lovejoy v. Watson, 475 F. App'x 792 (2d Cir. 2012)(affirming sua sponte dismissal).The Clerk is directed to close the case.Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 5/28/2021. (Brown, Gary) (Entered: 05/28/2021) | ||
Thursday, May 27, 2021 | ||
4 | 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) | |
3 | 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Rodin, Deanna). | |
Att: 1 (5/27/2021) Additional Corrections | ||
Incorrect Document Entry Information. Defendant was added to the case incorrectly; docket entry 1 was deleted and re-entered against corrected defendant. (Rodin, Deanna) | ||
Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) | ||
Wednesday, May 26, 2021 | ||
2 | 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Estate of Chandrakala Singh (Dass, Anil) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Estate of Chandrakala Singh. (Rodin, Deanna) Modified on 5/27/2021 (Rodin, Deanna). | |
Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please submit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) | ||
FILING FEE: $402, receipt number ANYEDC-14508899 (Rodin, Deanna) |