Green v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Michael H Simon |
Case #: | 6:21-cv-00920 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:0405g Review of Commissioner's Final Decision |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2021 |
Terminated: | Apr 04, 2022 |
Defendant
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
|
|
Plaintiff
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
|
GPO
Jul 07 2022
ORDER - The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Application for Fees Pursuant to EAJA, ECF 19. Signed on 7/7/2022 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) |
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, July 07, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order on Application for EAJA Fees
Thu 07/07 3:32 PM
ORDER - The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Application for Fees Pursuant to EAJA, ECF19 . Signed on 7/7/2022 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) |
|
Tuesday, July 05, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
oth_sup
Declaration
Tue 07/05 4:54 PM
Declaration of Stephanie M. Green of Net Worth for EAJA Application . Filed by Stephanie M. Green. (Evans, H.) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Attorney Fees -EAJA
Tue 07/05 4:53 PM
Unopposed Application for Fees Pursuant to EAJA . Filed by Stephanie M. Green. (Evans, H.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh A EAJA Timesheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 04, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
order
Judgment - Terminate Case
Mon 04/04 4:18 PM
JUDGMENT - Based on the stipulation of the parties, IT IS ADJUDGED that this matter is REMANDED to the administrative agency for further administrative proceeding, and the case is DISMISSED. Signed on 4/4/2022 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) (Main Document 17 replaced on 4/4/2022) (cw) |
|
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Remand
Mon 04/04 4:12 PM
Order for Remand - Signed on 4/4/2022 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Remand
Mon 04/04 3:22 PM
Stipulated Motion to Remand to Agency. Filed by Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Darcher, Edmund) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
order
Correction of the Record
Mon 04/04 4:53 PM
Order for Administrative Correction of the Record pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a) regarding17 Judgment. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The incorrect PDF was attached. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment.The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw) |
||
Friday, April 01, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 04/01 1:23 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time . Filed by Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Darcher, Edmund) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 04/01 4:27 PM
ORDER - The Court GRANTS Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, ECF13 . Defendant's brief is due by May 2, 2022. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) |
||
Monday, January 31, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
oth_ans
Social Security Plaintiffs Brief
Mon 01/31 11:54 PM
Plaintiffs Brief . Filed by Stephanie M. Green. Defendants brief is due by 4/1/2022. (Evans, H.) |
|
Friday, January 21, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 01/21 2:30 PM
ORDER - Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (ECF10 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's brief is due by January 31, 2022. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 01/21 12:24 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Opening Brief . Filed by Stephanie M. Green. (Evans, H.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 23, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
oth_doc
Administrative Record - Social Security
Tue 11/23 6:19 AM
Transcript of Social Security Administrative Record - Certification and Record of Service . Filed by Commissioner Social Security Administration. Plaintiffs brief is due by 1/24/2022. (Darcher, Edmund) |
|
Att: 1 CAR | ||
8 | 8
answer
Social Security Answer
Tue 11/23 6:18 AM
Answer to1 Social Security Complaint, . Filed by Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Darcher, Edmund) |
|
Monday, November 01, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Attorney Appearance
Mon 11/01 9:42 AM
Notice of Appearance of Edmund (Jack) Darcher appearing on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration . Filed by Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Darcher, Edmund) |
|
Monday, August 02, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons/Service Return (All Types)
Mon 08/02 11:18 AM
Return of Service Executed as to Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 7/26/2021, answer due on 11/23/2021. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney, Regional Counsel or Agency, and the U.S. Attorney General. (Evans, H.) |
|
Monday, June 21, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/21 2:01 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner Social Security Administration. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) |
|
4 | 4
order
4 - Social Security Procedural Order FORM EVENT
Mon 06/21 1:47 PM
Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (bd) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP FORM EVENT
Mon 06/21 1:24 PM
ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (ECF2 ) is GRANTED. Signed on 6/21/2021 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP
Mon 06/21 12:29 PM
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Stephanie M Green. (Evans, H.) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Social Security
Mon 06/21 12:27 PM
Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner under 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). (In forma pauperis status selected) . Filed by Stephanie M Green against Commissioner, Social Security. (Evans, H.) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |