Wilhelm v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-01893 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 19, 2021 4:56 AM EST |
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DuPont de Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
individually and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Incorporated
2 Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Bruce Wilhelm
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 28, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Status Report
Tue 09/28 6:54 PM
STATUS REPORT - Defendant BASF Corporation's General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by BASF Corp, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, June 22, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 06/22 1:13 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Wilhelm v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-1893-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Maryland (sshe, ) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/22 1:11 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/22 1:10 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9917083.), filed by Bruce Wilhelm. Service due by 9/20/2021(sshe, ) |