Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michelle V Larson
Case #: 3:21-bk-31224
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2021
Terminated:Jul 15, 2022
Plan Confirmed:Dec 22, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Pogo Energy, LLC, Debtor
PO Box 142646
Irving, TX 75014-2646
Represented By
Rachael L. Smiley
Ferguson Braswell Fraser Kubasta PC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
251 251 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 10/12 7:36 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 09/30/2022 filed by Debtor Pogo Energy, LLC. (Smiley, Rachael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
250 250 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Thu 10/06 7:00 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 06/30/2022 filed by Debtor Pogo Energy, LLC. (Smiley, Rachael)
Related: [-]