Bibliotechnical Athenaeum v. American University of Beirut
Original Case: 1:20-cv-04068
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01642 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 06, 2021 |
Terminated: | Mar 10, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 16, 2022 4:48 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
American University of Beirut
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Bibliotechnical Athenaeum
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/16/2022 4:37 AM EDT |
Tuesday, July 06, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Bibliotechnical Athenaeum, FILED. [3131618] 21-1642 [Entered: 07/06/2021 11:01 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Notice | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 17 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 03/19/2021, RECEIVED.[3131765] 21-1642 [Entered: 07/06/2021 12:12 PM] | |
3 | 3 11 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/19/2021, RECEIVED.[3131769] 21-1642 [Entered: 07/06/2021 12:15 PM] | |
4 | 4 7 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 06/14/2021, RECEIVED.[3131772] 21-1642 [Entered: 07/06/2021 12:16 PM] | |
5 | 5 2 pgs PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Bibliotechnical Athenaeum, district court receipt # ANYSDC-24754202, FILED.[3131775] 21-1642 [Entered: 07/06/2021 12:17 PM] | |
6 | 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3131777] 21-1642 [Entered: 07/06/2021 12:18 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |