Guillen v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-02019 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 07, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jul 14, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 03, 2022 4:20 AM EST |
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DuPont de Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
individually and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Incorporated
2 Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Nick Guillen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 14, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 07/15 9:25 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Nick Guillen against all Defendants (Werner, Michael) Refiled correctly in management case, and spread to applicable member case as listed on document, per Judge's filing instructions per CMO No 1 Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-02019-RMG(sshe, ) Modified to original document number (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) on 7/15/2021 (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 07, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 07/07 8:02 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Guillen v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-2019-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Southern Texas (sshe, ) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/07 8:01 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/07 8:01 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9943722.), filed by Nick Guillen. Service due by 10/5/2021(sshe, ) |