New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Gary R Brown
Referred: Anne Y Shields
Case #: 2:21-cv-03893
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2021
Terminated:Jul 28, 2021
Last checked: Friday Jan 07, 2022 4:16 AM EST
Defendant
The Levinbook Law Firm, P.C.
Plaintiff
Khaleeq Jenkins
Represented By
David M. Barshay
Barshay, Rizzo & Lopez, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 47 minutes ago
Wednesday, July 28, 2021
5 5 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 07/28 10:53 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. SO Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 7/28/2021. (Tirado, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 07/27 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Khaleeq Jenkins without prejudice (Barshay, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 13, 2021
order Order to Show Cause Tue 07/13 9:21 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. To assist the Court in its review of standing in this action, plaintiff is directed to respond via letter filed on ECF within 14 days of the date of this order, as follows: 1. Does plaintiff claim any concrete, particularized injury in fact from the statutory violations alleged herein? If so, please set forth such injury/injuries with particularity. 2. If plaintiff is not claiming any such concrete injury, in light of the Supreme Court's decision in Transunion LLC v. Ramirez , Slip Op. No. 20-297, 2021 WL 2599472 (U.S. June 25, 2021), counsel shall provide any authority or basis for plaintiff to assert standing in this action, or indicate whether the action should be dismissed. Defendant shall file any response thereto with ten days of the filing by plaintiff. Plaintiff is further directed to serve a copy of this order upon defendant and file proof of service forthwith. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 7/13/2021. (Meil, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 12, 2021
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 07/12 4:33 PM
Summons Issued as to The Levinbook Law Firm, P.C.. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 07/12 4:30 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 07/12 4:26 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 07/12 4:29 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 11, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Sun 07/11 1:09 PM
COMPLAINT against The Levinbook Law Firm, P.C. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14644855 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Khaleeq Jenkins. (Barshay, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons