Nevada District Court
Judge:James C Mahan
Referred: Cam Ferenbach
Case #: 2:21-cv-01344
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 14, 2021
Terminated:Aug 08, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jan 10, 2022 12:21 AM PST
Defendant
Gravity Transformation LLC
Represented By
Jing Zhao
Weide & Miller, Ltd.
contact info
F. Christopher Austin
Weide & Miller, Ltd.
contact info
Defendant
George Perelshteyn
Represented By
Jing Zhao
Weide & Miller, Ltd.
contact info
F. Christopher Austin
Weide & Miller, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
V Shred, LLC
Represented By
Benjamin S. White
Ipla LLP
contact info
Tara U Teegarden
Mcdonald Carano LLP
contact info
Rory T Kay
Mcdonald Carano Wilson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
48 48 misc AO 121 Copyright Report Wed 08/09 11:13 AM
AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (ALZ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1
Att: 47 Order
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
47 47 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Terminate Case Tue 08/08 12:32 PM
ORDER granting46 Stipulation to dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/2/2023. Case terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
46 46 motion Stipulation Mon 07/31 3:09 PM
Joint STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL by Plaintiff V Shred, LLC. (White, Benjamin) (dismissal)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Mon 05/08 10:15 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (ALZ)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
44 44 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Mon 05/08 10:15 AM
ORDER Granting43 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 8/29/2023. Motions due by 9/28/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/28/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/5/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
43 43 motion Stipulation Mon 05/01 3:09 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Sixth Request) re42 Order on Stipulation,,, by Plaintiff V Shred, LLC. (White, Benjamin) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
42 42 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 03/01 9:05 AM
ORDER Granting41 Stipulation to extend discovery deadlines. Motions due by 7/31/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/30/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/28/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
41 41 motion Stipulation Mon 02/27 4:36 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Fifth Request) re40 Order on Stipulation,,, by Plaintiff V Shred, LLC. (White, Benjamin) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
40 40 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 12/21 12:14 PM
ORDER Granting39 Stipulation to extend discovery deadlines. Motions due by 5/31/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/30/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/21/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
39 39 motion Stipulation Tue 12/20 5:18 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Fourth Request) re38 Order on Stipulation,,, by Plaintiff V Shred, LLC. (White, Benjamin) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
38 38 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 10/21 1:57 PM
ORDER Granting35 Stipulation to extend discovery deadlines. Motions due by 3/31/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/1/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/21/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
Related: [-]
minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Fri 10/21 10:55 AM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 10/21/2022 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Crtrm Administrator: T. Renfro ; Pla Counsel: Rory Kay, Benjamin White ; Def Counsel: F. Austin ; Recording start and end times: 10:05 - 10:51 am ; Courtroom: 3D ; All parties appeared via video conference for this hearing. The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of counsel. IT IS ORDERED that 27 Motion to Compel is DENIED as MOOT and no sanctions shall be imposed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 28 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 33 First Motion to Amend Complaint is DENIED as stated on the record. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
36 36 respm Response Thu 10/20 3:25 PM
RESPONSE to33 Motion to Amend/Correct by Defendant Gravity Transformation LLC. Replies due by 10/27/2022.(Austin, F.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Monday, October 17, 2022
35 35 motion Stipulation Mon 10/17 2:00 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND THE DEADLINES RELATED TO EXPERT DISCLOSURES by Defendants Gravity Transformation LLC, George Perelshteyn. (Austin, F.) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
34 34 2 pgs order Order Mon 10/17 1:59 PM
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a video conference hearing on Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint (ECF No.33 ), is scheduled for 10:00 AM, October 21, 2022, before Judge Cam Ferenbach. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel/the parties must email the Courtroom Administrator, Tawnee Renfro at Tawnee_Renfro@nvd.uscourts.gov, with an email address to be used for the video conference hearing by noon, October 20, 2022. See Order for further information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/17/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
33 33 motion Motion Amend/Correct Wed 10/12 12:34 PM
First MOTION to Amend1 Complaint, by Plaintiff V Shred, LLC. Responses due by 10/26/2022.(White, Benjamin) (pleading)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, October 06, 2022
32 32 2 pgs order Order Fri 10/07 11:04 AM
ORDER Re28 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time and27 Motion to Compel. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in LV Chambers - Videoconference before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/6/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
31 31 respm Reply Wed 09/21 11:00 AM
REPLY to Response to27 Motion to Compel by Plaintiff V Shred, LLC. (White, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
30 30 respm Response Tue 09/20 1:42 PM
RESPONSE to28 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Plaintiff V Shred, LLC. Replies due by 9/27/2022. (White, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
29 29 respm Response Wed 09/14 11:55 PM
RESPONSE to27 Motion to Compel by Defendants Gravity Transformation LLC, George Perelshteyn. Replies due by 9/21/2022.(Austin, F.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration F. Christopher Austin
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
28 28 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Tue 09/06 11:41 PM
MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re27 Motion to Compel by Defendant Gravity Transformation LLC. Responses due by 9/20/2022.(Austin, F.) (nondispositive)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
27 27 motion Motion Compel Tue 08/23 5:04 PM
MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO V SHREDS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES by Plaintiff V Shred, LLC. Responses due by 9/6/2022. (White, Benjamin) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
26 26 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 07/18 10:32 AM
ORDER Granting25 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 9/30/2022. Motions due by 1/30/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/1/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/18/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
25 25 motion Stipulation Fri 07/15 4:04 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) to Extend Discovery Deadlines by Plaintiff V Shred, LLC. (Teegarden, Tara) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
24 24 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Tue 03/29 12:41 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion to Extend Time- Discovery due by 7/29/2022. Motions due by 11/28/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/28/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2022
23 23 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Fri 03/25 5:53 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re20 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order,,, by Plaintiff V Shred, LLC. (White, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 03, 2022
22 22 17 pgs order Order on Stipulated Protective Order Mon 01/03 3:16 PM
ORDER Granting19 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/3/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Mon 01/03 3:11 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (KF)
Related: [-]
20 20 5 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Mon 01/03 3:10 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting18 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/27/2022. Motions due by 6/27/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/27/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/3/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 30, 2021
19 19 motion Stipulated Protective Order Thu 12/30 1:42 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Plaintiff V Shred, LLC. (White, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Thu 12/30 1:38 PM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff V Shred, LLC. (White, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 07, 2021
17 17 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 10/07 2:05 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Gravity Transformation LLC, George Perelshteyn. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Austin, F.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/29 4:37 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Gravity Transformation LLC, George Perelshteyn. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/13/2021.(Austin, F.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 31, 2021
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/31 11:35 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by V Shred, LLC re1 Complaint,7 Summons Issued. George Perelshteyn served on 8/10/2021. (Kay, Rory)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/31 11:33 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by V Shred, LLC re1 Complaint,7 Summons Issued. Gravity Transformation LLC served on 8/10/2021. (Kay, Rory)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 19, 2021
13 13 11 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/19 2:14 PM
ORDER granting9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin S. White and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Rory T. Kay. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/19/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 18, 2021
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 08/18 4:00 PM
ORDER granting11 Stipulation Re:1 Complaint. Gravity Transformation LLC's and George Perelshteyn's answers are due 9/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/18/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Stipulation Wed 08/18 1:07 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re1 Complaint, by Defendants Gravity Transformation LLC, George Perelshteyn. (Austin, F.)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice Appearance Wed 08/18 12:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney F. Christopher Austin on behalf of Defendants Gravity Transformation LLC, George Perelshteyn. (Austin, F.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
9 9 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Tue 08/17 4:03 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin S. White and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Rory T. Kay (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6599520) by Plaintiff V Shred, LLC. (Kay, Rory)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 22, 2021
8 8 misc Mail Returned Thu 07/22 1:46 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 6 Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP, addressed to Benjamin White. Return to sender, unable to forward. (HAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 15, 2021
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 07/15 3:01 PM
Summons Issued as to Gravity Transformation LLC, George Perelshteyn re1 Complaint. (DRS)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice Desig of Local Counsel & VP Thu 07/15 12:04 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Benjamin S. White to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 7/29/2021. (no image attached) (DRS)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Proposed Summons to be issued Thu 07/15 10:29 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re George Perelshteyn by Plaintiff V Shred, LLC. (Kay, Rory)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Proposed Summons to be issued Thu 07/15 10:26 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re Gravity Transformation LLC by Plaintiff V Shred, LLC. (Kay, Rory)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc AO 121 Copyright Report Thu 07/15 9:37 AM
AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (DRS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Thu 07/15 9:30 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DRS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 07/14 5:04 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by V Shred, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kay, Rory)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 07/14 4:56 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6558224) by V Shred, LLC. Proof of service due by 10/12/2021. (Kay, Rory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet