City of Dayton v. Chemicals Inc.
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-02143 |
Nature of Suit | 240 Real Property - Torts to Land |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Texas Southern, 4:21-cv-01765 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 12, 2022 3:51 AM EST |
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Dayton
101 West Third Street
Dayton, OH 45401 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, July 16, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 07/16 12:22 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Texas Southern, 4:21-cv-01765, City of Dayton v. Chemicals Inc, as DSC case 2:21-cv-02143-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 07/16 12:17 PM
Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:21-cv-01765. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, July 15, 2021 | ||
6 | 6 JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-59) transferring case to District of South Carolina to be included in MDL Docket No. 2873. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/16/2021.] | |
Interdistrict transfer to District of South Carolina. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/16/2021.] | ||
Thursday, July 08, 2021 | ||
5 | 5 SCHEDULING AND DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 11/4/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 10/5/2021 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 5/3/2022. Pltf Expert Report due by 5/3/2022. Deft Expert Witness List due by 6/2/2022. Deft Expert Report due by 6/2/2022. Discovery due by 6/17/2022. Mediation due by 9/2/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 7/19/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 7/19/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/4/2022. Docket Call set for 11/21/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/16/2021.] | |
Friday, July 02, 2021 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/2/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/16/2021.] | |
Wednesday, June 02, 2021 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Chemicals Incorporated. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/16/2021.] | |
Tuesday, June 01, 2021 | ||
2 | 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to City of Dayton, filed.(Haines, Patrick) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/16/2021.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Chemicals Incorporated (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26519995) filed by City of Dayton.(Haines, Patrick) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/16/2021.] |