Wilkerson v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-02375 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 30, 2021 |
Re-opened: | Jan 31, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jan 21, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 26, 2022 3:46 AM EST |
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Coporation Trust Company 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Eric Wilkerson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, January 31, 2022 | ||
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 01/31 1:11 PM
TEXT ORDER re 2134 (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 7 in 2:21-cv-02375-RMG). In member case No. 2:21-cv-2375-RMG, Plaintiff moves to reinstate claims pursuant to CMO No. 5. The claims were dismissed without prejudice with leave to refile for failure to provide a completed Plaintiff Fact Sheet (PFS). Plaintiff has now submitted the PFS and therefore moves to reinstate. The motion is GRANTED. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/31/2022. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-02375-RMG(sshe, ) |
||
Thursday, January 27, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Reopen Case
Thu 01/27 4:01 PM
First MOTION to Reopen Case by Eric Wilkerson. Response to Motion due by 2/10/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-02375-RMG(Zgoda, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proof of PFS Service | ||
Friday, January 21, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 01/21 1:31 PM
ORDER This Order Relates to Member Cases Listed in Exhibit A. The Defense Leadership's motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 2104 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (4) in case 2:21-cv-01983-RMG; (4) in case 2:21-cv-02303-RMG; (4) in case 2:21-cv-02375-RMG;(4) in case 2:21-cv-02521-RMG; (4) in case 2:21-cv-02605-RMG; (4) in case 2:21-cv-02674-RMG) is GRANTED. The claims of the plaintiffs in the member cases listed in Exhibit A are dismissed without prejudice and subject to reinstatement upon pursuant to the procedure set forth in CMO No. 5. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/21/2022.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 19, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss
Wed 01/19 3:05 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants. Response to Motion due by 2/2/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dukes, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs Who Failed to Serve Executed Plaintiff Fact Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Non-Compliance | ||
Friday, July 30, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 07/30 2:36 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Wilkerson v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-2375-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern Tennessee (sshe, ) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/30 2:35 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/30 2:34 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9989503.), filed by Eric Wilkerson. Service due by 10/28/2021(sshe, ) |