New York Southern District Court
Judge:Valerie E Caproni
Case #: 1:21-cv-06533
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause28:2201dj Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2021
Terminated:Nov 16, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Jan 29, 2022 4:35 AM EST
Defendant
Astek Innovations, Limited
Represented By
Brianne Straka
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Steven Carl Cherny
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Deborah K. Brown
Quinn Emanuel
contact info
Defendant
Young Innovations, Inc.
Represented By
Brianne Straka
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Steven Carl Cherny
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Deborah K. Brown
Quinn Emanuel
contact info
Plaintiff
AMD Medicom Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey A. Lindenbaum
Rothwell, Figg, Ernst & Manbeck, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Medicom Group Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey A. Lindenbaum
Rothwell, Figg, Ernst & Manbeck, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
22 22 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 11/18 10:37 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys for the parties herein, that, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(l)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this action and all claims therein are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs. This case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/17/2021) (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
21 21 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 11/16 1:17 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Astek Innovations, Limited, Young Innovations, Inc. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by AMD Medicom Inc., Medicom Group Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 11/16 12:13 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Astek Innovations, Limited, Young Innovations, Inc. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by AMD Medicom Inc., Medicom Group Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/16/2021 (dt)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Tue 11/16 12:26 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Lindenbaum, Jeffrey. RE-FILE Document No. 20 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed (ink signatures) by all parties who have appeared;. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned ink signature image) PDF. (dt)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 18, 2021
19 19 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 10/18 12:20 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jeffrey A. Lindenbaum on behalf of AMD Medicom Inc., Medicom Group Inc.. New Address: Rothwell, Figg, Ernst & Manbeck, P.C., The Holyoke-Manhattan Building, 80 South Highland Avenue, Ossining, NY, United States 10562, (914) 941-5668..(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 01, 2021
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/01 2:10 PM
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting17 Motion for Brianne McNicholas Straka to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/1/2021) (tg)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Fri 10/01 8:54 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 17 MOTION for Brianne McNicholas Straka to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25135497. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 30, 2021
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/30 5:27 PM
MOTION for Brianne McNicholas Straka to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25135497. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Astek Innovations, Limited, Young Innovations, Inc...(Straka, Brianne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Brianne Straka,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, September 24, 2021
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/24 5:15 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Deborah K. Brown on behalf of Astek Innovations, Limited, Young Innovations, Inc...(Brown, Deborah)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/24 5:06 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Carl Cherny on behalf of Astek Innovations, Limited, Young Innovations, Inc...(Cherny, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 09/21 10:34 AM
ORDER granting13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Defense counsel must file a notice of appearance on the docket by no later than Friday, September 24, 2021. The parties' request is GRANTED. Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is adjourned to Tuesday, November 16, 2021. The initial pre-trial conference, currently scheduled for Friday, October 1, 2021 at 3:00 P.M., is adjourned to Friday, December 3, 2021 at 11:00 A.M. Pre- conference submissions are due no later than Wednesday, November 24, 2021. For a description of the pre- conference submissions requirements, the parties should consult the Court's order at docket entry 11.The initial pre-trial conference will be held remotely. All parties and any interested members of the public must attend by dialing 1-888-363-4749, using the access code 3121171, and the security code 6533. All attendees are advised to mute their phones when not speaking and to self-identify each time they speak. Recording or rebroadcasting the proceeding is strictly prohibited by law. Upon a joint request, the Court is happy to refer the parties to their assigned Magistrate Judge for a settlement conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/20/21) (yv)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
13 13 motion Extension of Time Mon 09/20 7:27 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and for Adjournment of Initial Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Jeffrey A. Lindenbaum dated September 20, 2021. Document filed by AMD Medicom Inc., Medicom Group Inc...(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Set/Reset Hearings Tue 09/21 10:40 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants., Set/Reset Hearings:( Initial Conference set for 12/3/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (yv)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 02, 2021
7 7 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
6 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Young Innovations, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by AMD Medicom Inc., Medicom Group Inc...(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
5 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Astek Innovations, Limited, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by AMD Medicom Inc., Medicom Group Inc...(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
4 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Medicom Group Inc...(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by AMD Medicom Inc...(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Astek Innovations, Limited, Young Innovations, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24876573)Document filed by AMD Medicom Inc., Medicom Group Inc...(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]