District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Jia M Cobb
Referred: Moxila A Upadhyaya
Case #: 1:21-cv-02160
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1605A Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2021
Terminated:Oct 26, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 08, 2022 3:25 AM EST
Defendant
ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Plaintiff
NATASHA GURLEY
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MATTHEW BEIN
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DONALD HUGHES
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DANIEL HYDE
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ANGELA JAEGER
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DANIEL KIMBALL
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
RYAN KRINGLE
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ROGER LOBATO
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
AVIA MCCOY
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
NATHAN MCCOY
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JAY MURRAY
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
EVERETT PATTON
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
GEORGE PEREZ
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DELISA PERKINS
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
PRESTON PERKINS
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
AARON POLSTER
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KRISTOPHER REDDING
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JOE RYBOLT
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MARK SHINN
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CYNTHIA STEVER
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JUANITA THROGMORTON
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DAVID UTTERBACK
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
FRANK WALLMAN
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KENNETH GOTTSMAN
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
BRIAN BENGIER
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JUSTIN BISCIAIO
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN BLANSETT
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
RICHARD BOWEN
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
TRENT BRINING
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KC BROWN
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KYLE BROWN
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LEO BUEHLER
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
REBEKAH BUEHLER
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
FERNANDO CARDOSO
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CRAIG CHACON
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
PATRICIA CLEM
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
RICHARD CLEM
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
RHONDA COMSTOCK
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIAM CONGLETON
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JORDAN DEULEY
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JUSTIN DEULEY
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHELLE DEULEY
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
BARBARA ERICKSON
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DANIEL ERICKSON
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KATHY GIBSON
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIAM GIBSON
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CEDRIC GRIER
Represented By
Timothy R. West
Bertram & Graf, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
order .Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 02/04 11:54 AM
MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Group 1 Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment30 is referred to a Magistrate Judge, to be assigned at random by the Clerk's Office, for purposes of issuing a Report and Recommendation on the motion. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on February 4, 2025. (lcjmc2)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Wed 02/05 9:45 AM
CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya for Report and Recommendation re30 Motion for Default Judgment. (zsl)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
30 30 motion Default Judgment Fri 01/31 2:49 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to GROUP 1 PLAINTIFFS by LEO BUEHLER, REBEKAH BUEHLER, FERNANDO CARDOSO, RICHARD CLEM, PATRICIA CLEM, WILLIAM CONGLETON, MICHELLE DEULEY, JUSTIN DEULEY, JORDAN DEULEY, DANIEL ERICKSON, BARBARA ERICKSON, KATHY GIBSON, WILLIAM GIBSON, ANGELA JAEGER, CEDRIC GRIER, DONALD HUGHES, RYAN KRINGLE, JAY MURRAY, EVERETT PATTON, PRESTON PERKINS, DELISA PERKINS, AARON POLSTER, MARK SHINN, TRENT BRINING, RHONDA COMSTOCK.(McGill, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 01/21 4:14 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting29 Motion to Alter Group 1 and Group 2 Plaintiffs: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs'29 Motion to Alter Group 1 and Group 2 Plaintiffs is GRANTED. Plaintiff Aaron Polster, formerly assigned to Group 1, shall now proceed with Group 2. Plaintiff Jay Murray, formerly assigned to Group 2, shall now proceed with Group 1. See Sept. 24, 2024 Minute Order. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on January 21, 2025. (lcjmc2)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
29 29 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 01/17 6:39 PM
MOTION To Alter Group 1 and Group 2 Plaintiffs by JAY MURRAY, AARON POLSTER.(McGill, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/17 10:00 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. McGill on behalf of REBEKAH BUEHLER, FERNANDO CARDOSO, WILLIAM CONGLETON (McGill, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
27 27 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 01/13 1:21 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DELISA PERKINS (Carlson, Craig)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 01/13 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by RICHARD CLEM, PATRICIA CLEM (Carlson, Craig)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 09/26 5:59 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting25 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: The motion to withdraw appearance of Timothy R. West is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on September 26, 2024. (lcjmc2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
25 25 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 09/25 5:16 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by MATTHEW BEIN, BRIAN BENGIER, JUSTIN BISCIAIO, JOHN BLANSETT, RICHARD BOWEN, TRENT BRINING, KC BROWN, KYLE BROWN, LEO BUEHLER, REBEKAH BUEHLER, FERNANDO CARDOSO, CRAIG CHACON, PATRICIA CLEM, RICHARD CLEM, RHONDA COMSTOCK, WILLIAM CONGLETON, JORDAN DEULEY, JUSTIN DEULEY, MICHELLE DEULEY, BARBARA ERICKSON, DANIEL ERICKSON, KATHY GIBSON, WILLIAM GIBSON, KENNETH GOTTSMAN, CEDRIC GRIER, NATASHA GURLEY, DONALD HUGHES, DANIEL HYDE, ANGELA JAEGER, DANIEL KIMBALL, RYAN KRINGLE, ROGER LOBATO, AVIA MCCOY, NATHAN MCCOY, JAY MURRAY, EVERETT PATTON, GEORGE PEREZ, DELISA PERKINS, PRESTON PERKINS, AARON POLSTER, KRISTOPHER REDDING, JOE RYBOLT, MARK SHINN, CYNTHIA STEVER, JUANITA THROGMORTON, DAVID UTTERBACK, FRANK WALLMAN. (West, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 09/24 5:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER re22 23 Status Report: The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs'22 23 Status Report and ORDERS that Group 1 Plaintiffs ( see ECF 22 at 1) shall move for default judgment by January 31, 2025. It is further ORDERED that Group 2 Plaintiffs ( see ECF 22 at 2) shall propose a deadline to file a motion for default judgment following the final disposition of appellate proceedings in Borochov v. Islamic Republic of Iran , No. 24-277 (U.S.). Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on September 24, 2024. (lcjmc2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 09/19 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Matthew D. McGill (McGill, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
23 23 misc Errata Wed 09/18 3:11 PM
ERRATA Corrected Text of Proposed Order by TRENT BRINING, LEO BUEHLER, REBEKAH BUEHLER, FERNANDO CARDOSO, PATRICIA CLEM, RICHARD CLEM, RHONDA COMSTOCK, WILLIAM CONGLETON, JORDAN DEULEY, JUSTIN DEULEY, MICHELLE DEULEY, BARBARA ERICKSON, DANIEL ERICKSON, KATHY GIBSON, WILLIAM GIBSON, CEDRIC GRIER, DONALD HUGHES, ANGELA JAEGER, RYAN KRINGLE, JAY MURRAY, EVERETT PATTON, DELISA PERKINS, PRESTON PERKINS, AARON POLSTER, MARK SHINN re22 Status Report,. (McGill, Matthew)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Status Report Wed 09/18 2:19 PM
STATUS REPORT by TRENT BRINING, LEO BUEHLER, REBEKAH BUEHLER, FERNANDO CARDOSO, PATRICIA CLEM, RICHARD CLEM, RHONDA COMSTOCK, WILLIAM CONGLETON, JORDAN DEULEY, JUSTIN DEULEY, MICHELLE DEULEY, BARBARA ERICKSON, DANIEL ERICKSON, KATHY GIBSON, WILLIAM GIBSON, CEDRIC GRIER, DONALD HUGHES, ANGELA JAEGER, RYAN KRINGLE, JAY MURRAY, EVERETT PATTON, DELISA PERKINS, PRESTON PERKINS, AARON POLSTER, MARK SHINN.(McGill, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/18 2:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. McGill on behalf of WILLIAM GIBSON (McGill, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
20 20 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Wed 08/21 3:25 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Order,,,, Set Deadlines,,, filed by TRENT BRINING, LEO BUEHLER, REBEKAH BUEHLER, FERNANDO CARDOSO, PATRICIA CLEM, RICHARD CLEM, RHONDA COMSTOCK, WILLIAM CONGLETON, JORDAN DEULEY, JUSTIN DEULEY, MICHELLE DEULEY, BARBARA ERICKSON, DANIEL ERICKSON, KATHY GIBSON, WILLIAM GIBSON, CEDRIC GRIER, DONALD HUGHES, ANGELA JAEGER, RYAN KRINGLE, JAY MURRAY, EVERETT PATTON, DELISA PERKINS, PRESTON PERKINS, AARON POLSTER, MARK SHINN. (McGill, Matthew)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/21 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Carlson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Carlson, Craig)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/21 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. McGill on behalf of TRENT BRINING, LEO BUEHLER, RICHARD CLEM, RHONDA COMSTOCK, JORDAN DEULEY, JUSTIN DEULEY, MICHELLE DEULEY, BARBARA ERICKSON, DANIEL ERICKSON, KATHY GIBSON, CEDRIC GRIER, DONALD HUGHES, ANGELA JAEGER, RYAN KRINGLE, JAY MURRAY, EVERETT PATTON, PRESTON PERKINS, AARON POLSTER, MARK SHINN (McGill, Matthew)
Related: [-]
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 08/21 4:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER re20 Response to Order to Show Cause: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs'20 response to this Court's order to show cause, the Court agrees that dismissal is inappropriate given that Plaintiffs' counsel "only recently took over the case" and "intends to prosecute this action with haste." As such, consistent with Plaintiffs' request, the Court ORDERS that Plaintiffs shall file a status report on September 18, 2024, in which they shall propose a new deadline for their motion for default judgment. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on August 21, 2024. (lcjmc2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 08/14 10:56 AM
MINUTE ORDER: On July 1, 2024, the Court advised Plaintiffs in this matter that it may dismiss the case for want of prosecution if no motion for default judgment was filed by July 15, 2024. On July 25, 2024, Plaintiffs' counsel filed a17 notice advising the Court that some Plaintiffs wished to voluntarily dismiss their claims, others wished to maintain their causes of action, and "substitute counsel will be entering their appearance shortly." Three weeks have passed with no further action. As such, the Court ORDERS that Plaintiffs shall either file a motion for default judgment or show cause as to why this action should not be dismissed for want of prosecution by August 21, 2024. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on August 14, 2024. (lcjmc2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 07/25 9:46 AM
ERRATA re16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MATTHEW BEIN, BRIAN BENGIER, JUSTIN BISCIAIO, JOHN BLANSETT, RICHARD BOWEN, KC BROWN, KYLE BROWN, CRAIG CHACON, KENNETH GOTTSMAN, NATASHA GURLEY, DANIEL HYDE, DANIEL KIMBALL, ROGER LOBATO, AVIA MCCOY, NATHAN MCCOY, GEORGE PEREZ, KRISTOPHER REDDING, JOE RYBOLT, CYNTHIA STEVER, JUANITA THROGMORTON, DAVID UTTERBACK, FRANK WALLMAN (West, Timothy) Modified docket text on 7/25/2024 (zdp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 07/24 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (West, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 07/01 2:57 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Clerk's office entered default as to the sole Defendant in this action on November 9, 2023. Since then, Plaintiffs have taken no further action. The Court hereby ORDERS that Plaintiffs file a motion for default judgment by July 15, 2024, or the Court may dismiss the case without prejudice for want of prosecution. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on July 1, 2024. (lcjmc2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
15 15 1 pgs misc Clerks Entry of Default Thu 11/09 8:36 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN (znmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
14 14 misc Affidavit for Default Wed 11/08 2:12 PM
AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT by MATTHEW BEIN, BRIAN BENGIER, JUSTIN BISCIAIO, JOHN BLANSETT, RICHARD BOWEN, TRENT BRINING, KC BROWN, KYLE BROWN, LEO BUEHLER, REBEKAH BUEHLER, FERNANDO CARDOSO, CRAIG CHACON, PATRICIA CLEM, RICHARD CLEM, RHONDA COMSTOCK, WILLIAM CONGLETON, JORDAN DEULEY, JUSTIN DEULEY, MICHELLE DEULEY, BARBARA ERICKSON, DANIEL ERICKSON, KATHY GIBSON, WILLIAM GIBSON, KENNETH GOTTSMAN, CEDRIC GRIER, NATASHA GURLEY, DONALD HUGHES, DANIEL HYDE, ANGELA JAEGER, DANIEL KIMBALL, RYAN KRINGLE, ROGER LOBATO, AVIA MCCOY, NATHAN MCCOY, JAY MURRAY, EVERETT PATTON, GEORGE PEREZ, DELISA PERKINS, PRESTON PERKINS, AARON POLSTER, KRISTOPHER REDDING, JOE RYBOLT, MARK SHINN, CYNTHIA STEVER, JUANITA THROGMORTON, DAVID UTTERBACK, FRANK WALLMAN. (West, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
order .Order Order to Show Cause Thu 10/26 9:32 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The Complaint in this case was filed on August 12, 2021. ECF 1. The docket reflects that the Defendant was served on June 15, 2022, and Defendant's answer was due August 14, 2022. ECF 13. No response to the Complaint has been filed, and Plaintiffs have not taken any additional measures to prosecute this case. Therefore, it is ORDERED that no later than November 9, 2023, Plaintiffs shall either file for default or take other appropriate action to prosecute these claims. It is further ORDERED that should Plaintiffs fail to take further action to prosecute these claims, the Court will dismiss the case without prejudice for want of prosecution. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on October 26, 2023. (lcjmc2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed as to Foreign State or Agency Mon 08/08 2:46 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN served on 6/15/2022, answer due 8/14/2022. (Originals returned to counsel) (zjf)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Affidavit of Service by DOS on Foreign State/Agency Mon 08/08 2:45 PM
ENTERED IN ERROR.....AFFIDAVIT of Service by the U.S. Department of State upon ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN re9 Affidavit Requesting Foreign Mailing. (Originals returned to counsel) (zjf) Modified on 8/8/2022 (zjf)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 20, 2021
11 11 misc Certificate of Clerk - 28USC1608(a)(4) Mon 12/20 3:36 PM
CERTIFICATE OF CLERK of mailing two copies of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state on Defendant, by FedEx, to the U. S. Department of State, Director of Overseas Citizens Services, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (zjf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Waybill
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
9 9 misc Affidavit Requesting Foreign Mailing Tue 12/14 7:06 PM
AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING by MATTHEW BEIN, BRIAN BENGIER, JUSTIN BISCIAIO, JOHN BLANSETT, RICHARD BOWEN, TRENT BRINING, KC BROWN, KYLE BROWN, LEO BUEHLER, REBEKAH BUEHLER, FERNANDO CARDOSO, CRAIG CHACON, PATRICIA CLEM, RICHARD CLEM, RHONDA COMSTOCK, WILLIAM CONGLETON, JORDAN DEULEY, JUSTIN DEULEY, MICHELLE DEULEY, BARBARA ERICKSON, DANIEL ERICKSON, KATHY GIBSON, WILLIAM GIBSON, KENNETH GOTTSMAN, CEDRIC GRIER, NATASHA GURLEY, DONALD HUGHES, DANIEL HYDE, ANGELA JAEGER, DANIEL KIMBALL, RYAN KRINGLE, ROGER LOBATO, AVIA MCCOY, NATHAN MCCOY, JAY MURRAY, EVERETT PATTON, GEORGE PEREZ, DELISA PERKINS, PRESTON PERKINS, AARON POLSTER, KRISTOPHER REDDING, JOE RYBOLT, MARK SHINN, CYNTHIA STEVER, JUANITA THROGMORTON, DAVID UTTERBACK, FRANK WALLMAN.(West, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 a$ Service Letter to Clerk
misc Request -1608(a)(4) Mon 12/20 3:31 PM
REQUEST from Plaintiffs for the Clerk to effect service of two copies of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state, by certified mail, return receipt requested, to the U. S. Department of State, Director of Overseas Citizens Services, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (See Docket Entry9 to view document) (zjf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 11/16 8:42 AM
Case directly reassigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. Judge Randolph D. Moss is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
7 7 misc Certificate of Clerk -1608(a)(3) -DHL Tue 10/26 2:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF CLERK of mailing one copy of the summons and complaint, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state on Defendant, by DHL, to the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (zjf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Waybill
misc Request - 1608(a)(3) - DHL Tue 10/26 4:18 PM
REQUEST for the Clerk to effect service of one copy of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state, by DHL, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (See Docket Entry6 to view document). (znmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
6 6 misc Affidavit Requesting Foreign Mailing Wed 09/29 12:25 PM
AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING by MATTHEW BEIN, BRIAN BENGIER, JUSTIN BISCIAIO, JOHN BLANSETT, RICHARD BOWEN, TRENT BRINING, KC BROWN, KYLE BROWN, LEO BUEHLER, REBEKAH BUEHLER, FERNANDO CARDOSO, CRAIG CHACON, PATRICIA CLEM, RICHARD CLEM, RHONDA COMSTOCK, WILLIAM CONGLETON, JORDAN DEULEY, JUSTIN DEULEY, MICHELLE DEULEY, BARBARA ERICKSON, DANIEL ERICKSON, KATHY GIBSON, WILLIAM GIBSON, KENNETH GOTTSMAN, CEDRIC GRIER, NATASHA GURLEY, DONALD HUGHES, DANIEL HYDE, ANGELA JAEGER, DANIEL KIMBALL, RYAN KRINGLE, ROGER LOBATO, AVIA MCCOY, NATHAN MCCOY, JAY MURRAY, EVERETT PATTON, GEORGE PEREZ, DELISA PERKINS, PRESTON PERKINS, AARON POLSTER, KRISTOPHER REDDING, JOE RYBOLT, MARK SHINN, CYNTHIA STEVER, JUANITA THROGMORTON, DAVID UTTERBACK, FRANK WALLMAN.(West, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Cover letter to Court
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
5 5 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 08/17 11:26 AM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN. (ztd)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 16, 2021
4 4 cmp Request for Summons to Issue Mon 08/16 1:50 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by JUANITA THROGMORTON, ROGER LOBATO, BARBARA ERICKSON, RHONDA COMSTOCK, CEDRIC GRIER, MICHELLE DEULEY, BRIAN BENGIER, MATTHEW BEIN, JUSTIN DEULEY, DANIEL KIMBALL, WILLIAM CONGLETON, MARK SHINN, NATASHA GURLEY, KENNETH GOTTSMAN, DONALD HUGHES, DELISA PERKINS, DANIEL ERICKSON, RICHARD CLEM, ANGELA JAEGER, LEO BUEHLER, RYAN KRINGLE, AVIA MCCOY, REBEKAH BUEHLER, KRISTOPHER REDDING, KATHY GIBSON, DAVID UTTERBACK, CRAIG CHACON, WILLIAM GIBSON, DANIEL HYDE, TRENT BRINING, PRESTON PERKINS, JAY MURRAY, JUSTIN BISCIAIO, KYLE BROWN, AARON POLSTER, FERNANDO CARDOSO, FRANK WALLMAN, PATRICIA CLEM, GEORGE PEREZ, KC BROWN, JOHN BLANSETT, NATHAN MCCOY, CYNTHIA STEVER, EVERETT PATTON, JOE RYBOLT, JORDAN DEULEY, RICHARD BOWEN.(West, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 13, 2021
3 3 order .Order Fri 08/13 4:45 PM
STANDING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/13/2021. (lcrdm2)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Request for Summons to Issue Fri 08/13 3:09 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by JUANITA THROGMORTON, ROGER LOBATO, BARBARA ERICKSON, RHONDA COMSTOCK, CEDRIC GRIER, MICHELLE DEULEY, BRIAN BENGIER, MATTHEW BEIN, JUSTIN DEULEY, DANIEL KIMBALL, WILLIAM CONGLETON, MARK SHINN, NATASHA GURLEY, KENNETH GOTTSMAN, DONALD HUGHES, DELISA PERKINS, DANIEL ERICKSON, RICHARD CLEM, ANGELA JAEGER, LEO BUEHLER, RYAN KRINGLE, AVIA MCCOY, REBEKAH BUEHLER, KRISTOPHER REDDING, KATHY GIBSON, DAVID UTTERBACK, CRAIG CHACON, WILLIAM GIBSON, DANIEL HYDE, TRENT BRINING, PRESTON PERKINS, JAY MURRAY, JUSTIN BISCIAIO, KYLE BROWN, AARON POLSTER, FERNANDO CARDOSO, FRANK WALLMAN, PATRICIA CLEM, GEORGE PEREZ, KC BROWN, JOHN BLANSETT, NATHAN MCCOY, CYNTHIA STEVER, EVERETT PATTON, JOE RYBOLT, JORDAN DEULEY, RICHARD BOWEN.(West, Timothy)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 08/13 3:15 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of QC- New Case Fri 08/13 3:21 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR re1 Complaint; emailed to tim@bertramgraf.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing/incorrect summonses. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to issue. (zsb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 12, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/12 2:25 PM
COMPLAINT against The Islamic Republic of Iran ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8664243) filed by JUANITA THROGMORTON, ROGER LOBATO, BARBARA ERICKSON, RHONDA COMSTOCK, CEDRIC GRIER, MICHELLE DEULEY, BRIAN BENGIER, MATTHEW BEIN, JUSTIN DEULEY, DANIEL KIMBALL, WILLIAM CONGLETON, MARK SHINN, NATASHA GURLEY, KENNETH GOTTSMAN, DONALD HUGHES, DELISA PERKINS, DANIEL ERICKSON, RICHARD CLEM, ANGELA JAEGER, LEO BUEHLER, RYAN KRINGLE, AVIA MCCOY, REBEKAH BUEHLER, KRISTOPHER REDDING, KATHY GIBSON, DAVID UTTERBACK, CRAIG CHACON, WILLIAM GIBSON, DANIEL HYDE, TRENT BRINING, PRESTON PERKINS, JAY MURRAY, JUSTIN BISCIAIO, KYLE BROWN, AARON POLSTER, FERNANDO CARDOSO, FRANK WALLMAN, PATRICIA CLEM, GEORGE PEREZ, KC BROWN, JOHN BLANSETT, NATHAN MCCOY, CYNTHIA STEVER, EVERETT PATTON, JOE RYBOLT, JORDAN DEULEY, RICHARD BOWEN.(West, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet