USA v. Trevino
Texas Northern District Court | |
Case #: | 1:21-cr-00046 |
Case Filed: | Jul 14, 2021 |
Last checked: Friday Aug 13, 2021 2:58 AM CDT |
Defendant
Ruben Lee Trevino (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/09/2022 7:55 AM CST |
Wednesday, July 14, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 Sealed Motion to Seal Indictment as to Ruben Lee Trevino. (amg) | |
2 | 2 ORDER granting1 Sealed Motion to Seal Indictment/Other Charging Doc/Case until initial appearance of defendant in federal court (clerk note: to be served on AUSA only) as to Ruben Lee Trevino (1). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 7/14/2021) (amg) | |
3 | 3 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Ruben Lee Trevino (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, and Forfeiture Notice. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (amg) |