Creel et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:21-cv-81428 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Aug 18, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 20, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Louisiana Middle, 3:21-cv-00448 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 15, 2022 4:58 AM EST |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V.
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline (America), Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline P.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Glaxosmithkline LLC
|
|
Defendant
Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer Inc
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Becky Creel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Creel
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, November 02, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
MDL 2924 Final Judgment
Thu 11/02 2:59 PM
RULE 58 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/26/2023. See attached document for full details. (jas) |
|
Friday, November 04, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Fri 11/04 11:32 AM
Second MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form -2 against Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC, Pfizer Inc, Sanofi S.A., Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, filed by Becky Creel, Richard Creel.(Palmintier, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, July 13, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Wed 07/13 6:14 PM
First MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Becky Creel, Richard Creel.(Palmintier, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, September 21, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Tue 09/21 12:48 PM
MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form -2 against All Defendants, filed by Becky Creel, Richard Creel.(Palmintier, Michael) |
|
Friday, August 20, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
order
Administrative Order
Fri 08/20 3:59 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/20/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Wednesday, August 18, 2021 | ||
8 | 8 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Middle District of Louisiana. Case Number 3:21-cv-00448 with documents 1-5. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81428-RLR Creel et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al on 8/18/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 70. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) | |
7 | 7 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) | |
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Wed 08/18 9:47 AM
Case transferred in from Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:21-cv-00448. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc). |
|
Tuesday, August 17, 2021 | ||
5 | 5 Order Transferring Case to JPML Court.(LLH) | |
Att: 1 Transfer Order | ||
4 | 4 Initial Conditional Transfer Order from the JPML Panel. (LLH) | |
Att: 1 Min Order NEF | ||
Wednesday, August 04, 2021 | ||
3 | 3 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (EDC) | |
Tuesday, August 03, 2021 | ||
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (Sheppard, James) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number C-708969 24. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2326608), filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Sheppard, James) | |
Att: 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Petition, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - State Court Records |