New York Southern District Court
Judge:George B Daniels
Referred: Ona T Wang
Case #: 1:21-cv-06959
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Aug 18, 2021
Terminated:Oct 29, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 15, 2022 5:43 AM EST
Defendant
A Canaan 168 Inc.
Defendant
Hui Qin He
Defendant
Min Chen
Defendant
Ricky Winata
Plaintiff
Shiqiang Gao
Represented By
John Troy
Troy Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 58 minutes ago
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
36 36 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Tue 10/29 12:39 PM
ORDER: In light of Plaintiffs Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (ECF No. 35), the Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate this action. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/28/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
misc Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal Fri 10/18 8:49 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 35 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,, was reviewed and referred to Judge George B. Daniels for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal in a Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA) case. (nd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
35 35 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 10/17 1:07 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) A Canaan 168 Inc., Hui Qin He, Min Chen, Ricky Winata. Document filed by Shiqiang Gao. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Troy, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
34 34 4 pgs order Order to Show Cause ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 10/11 11:00 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by October 18, 2024, why service of process on the four Defendants was proper under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, and why I should not recommend dismissal for failure to prosecute under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Plaintiff has failed to show good cause to extend the time for service; Plaintiff's requested extension is DENIED. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated:32 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Reserve Defendants with Summons and Complaint /gd addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from John Troy dated September 10, 2024. filed by Shiqiang Gao. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 10/11/2024) (sgz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
33 33 order Amended Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 09/26 11:28 AM
AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Specific Non-Dispositive Motion/Dispute: ECF No. 32. Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. Motions referred to Ona T. Wang. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/26/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
32 32 motion Extension of Time Tue 09/10 8:44 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Reserve Defendants with Summons and Complaint /gd addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from John Troy dated September 10, 2024. Document filed by Shiqiang Gao..(Troy, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
31 31 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Fri 05/05 11:55 AM
ORDER: denying without prejudice20 Motion for Default Judgment. Settlement discussions are ongoing before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. Accordingly,Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (ECF No. 20) is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff may renew their motion if the parties are unable to reach a settlement. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the open motion at ECF No. 20. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/05/2023) (ama)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 05/02 2:40 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang: Settlement Conference held on 4/20/2023. (Quinn, Diane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
30 30 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/18 1:38 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff Shiqiang Gao shall be permitted to attend the Settlement Conference scheduled for April 20, 2023, virtually. (ECF 87). Plaintiff refers to their prior filing of a motion to testify remotely at trial (ECF 84) as a motion to appear virtually at the Settlement Conference (ECF 87). This Order applies to the Settlement Conference only. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 4/18/2023) (rro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2023
29 29 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/02 5:10 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will hold an in-person Settlement Conference on April 20, 2023, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. Counsel shall review and comply with the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases § VI upon receipt of this Scheduling Order. The parties' Ex Parte Settlement Conference Summary Forms and Letters shall be submitted by April 13, 2023. SO ORDERED. ( Settlement Conference set for 4/20/2023 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 2/2/2023) (rro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
28 28 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 01/31 5:55 PM
ORDER: The Court will hold a Pre-Settlement Conference Scheduling Call this Thursday on February 2, 2023, at 3:00 p.m. Counsel for Defendants is directed to dial-in at 3:00 p.m. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to dial-in at 3:30 p.m. ( Telephone Conference set for 2/2/2023 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 1/31/2023) (rro)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 23, 2022
27 27 misc Status Report Fri 12/23 2:08 PM
STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Shiqiang Gao..(Schweitzer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
26 26 misc Status Report Wed 12/07 10:04 AM
STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Shiqiang Gao..(Schweitzer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
25 25 service Certificate of Service Other Mon 11/21 8:06 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Affirmation in Support of Default Judgment with Ex 1 Complt and Ex 2 Certificate of Default (Docket Entry No. 24 with Exhibits) served on A CANAAN 168 INC., RICKY WIANTA, HUI QIN HE, MIN CHEN on November 21, 2022. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Shiqiang Gao..(Troy, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
24 24 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 11/21 6:52 PM
DECLARATION of John Troy in Support re:20 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants /mh .. Document filed by Shiqiang Gao..(Troy, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 01 Complaint with Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 02 Certificate of Default /mh
Saturday, November 19, 2022
23 23 service Certificate of Service Other Sat 11/19 3:23 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order dated October 12, 2022, Docket Entry No. 19, Notice of Motion for Default Judgment, No. 20, Declaration in Support, No. 21, and Memorandum of Law in Support, No. 22 served on A CANAAN 168 INC., RICKY WIANTA, HUI QIN HE, MIN CHEN on November 19, 2022. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Shiqiang Gao..(Troy, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 01 Documents Served
22 22 11 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Sat 11/19 1:59 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:20 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants /mh . . Document filed by Shiqiang Gao..(Troy, John)
Related: [-]
21 21 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Sat 11/19 1:59 PM
DECLARATION of John Troy in Support re:20 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants /mh .. Document filed by Shiqiang Gao..(Troy, John)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Default Judgment Sat 11/19 1:58 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants /mh . Document filed by Shiqiang Gao..(Troy, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
19 19 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 10/12 2:58 PM
ORDER: The Court held a post-discovery status conference on October 12, 2022. (ECF 78). I. Gao v. A Canaan Sushi Inc. et al., No. 18-cv-6442 Defendants' anticipated motion for summary judgment is due November 7, 2022. Plaintiff's opposition is due December 7, 2022. Defendants' reply is due December 21, 2022. II. Gao v. A Canaan 168 Inc. et al., No. 21-cv-6959 Plaintiff's anticipated motion for default judgment is due November 18, 2022. Defendants' opposition, if any, is due December 16, 2022. Plaintiff's reply, if any, is due December 23, 2022. The parties are directed to respond to the mediator's proposal by 5:00 p.m. on October 17, 2022, by separately emailing Chambers at Wang_NYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. (Motions due by 11/18/2022., Responses due by 12/16/2022, Replies due by 12/23/2022.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 10/12/2022) (rro)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Tue 11/01 3:02 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang: Status Conference held on 10/12/2022. (Quinn, Diane)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
order Order Fri 10/07 5:20 PM
ORDER. The post-discovery status conference scheduled for October 6, 2022, (ECF 17) is adjourned to October 12, 2022, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang) (Text Only Order) (jhw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
17 17 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 08/11 9:35 AM
ORDER, The parties are directed to appear for a post-discovery status conference on October 6, 2022 at 10:30am in Courtroom 20D at 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. The parties are directed to separately file agendas three days before the conference (October 3, 2022) and be prepared to discuss how they intend to move these cases forward. SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 10/6/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 8/10/22) (yv)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2022
16 16 misc Clerk's Certificate of Default Mon 06/06 2:35 PM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to A CANAAN 168 INC. d/b/a Canaan Sushi; RICKY WINATA; HUI QIN HE a/k/a Huiqin He; and MIN CHEN. (tp)
Related: [-]
15 15 respoth Affirmation in Support (non-motion) Mon 06/06 1:59 PM
AFFIRMATION of John Troy /mh in Support re:14 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by Shiqiang Gao..(Schweitzer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default Mon 06/06 1:58 PM
PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Shiqiang Gao..(Schweitzer, Aaron) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 07, 2022
13 13 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 02/07 4:38 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/07/2022) (ama)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 17, 2021
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 12/17 8:25 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. Hui Qin He served on 11/16/2021, answer due 12/7/2021. Document filed by Shiqiang Gao..(Troy, John)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 12/17 8:24 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. A Canaan 168 Inc. served on 11/16/2021, answer due 12/7/2021. Document filed by Shiqiang Gao..(Troy, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/15 6:26 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. Ricky Winata served on 9/11/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. Service was accepted by "John Doe". Document filed by Shiqiang Gao..(Troy, John)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/15 6:23 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. Min Chen served on 9/11/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. Service was accepted by "John Doe". Document filed by Shiqiang Gao..(Troy, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
utility Case Accepted as Related Wed 09/08 8:50 AM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-cv-06442-GBD-OTW. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Wed 09/08 8:55 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 09/08 8:58 AM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vba)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 25, 2021
8 8 service Summons Issued Wed 08/25 11:38 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to A Canaan 168 Inc., Hui Qin He, Min Chen, Ricky Winata. (vf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 24, 2021
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 08/24 10:15 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to A CANAAN 168 INC d/b/a Canaan Sushi, RICKY WINATA, HUI QIN HE a/k/a Huiqin He, and MIN CHEN, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Shiqiang Gao..(Troy, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 20, 2021
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 08/20 3:31 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Troy to RE-FILE Document No. 6 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the 'as to' docket entry text and the attached rider does not match exactly as it appears on the pleading caption (Ricky Wanta). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 19, 2021
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 08/19 11:48 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to A CANAAN 168 INC d/b/a Canaan Sushi; RICKY WANTA; HUI QIN HE a/k/a Huiqin He; and MIN CHEN, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Shiqiang Gao..(Troy, John)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Statement of Relatedness Thu 08/19 11:46 AM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-cv-06442 (GBD) (OTW). Document filed by Shiqiang Gao..(Troy, John)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 08/19 11:44 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Troy, John)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 08/19 10:08 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Troy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: A CANAAN 168 INC, MIN CHEN, HUI QIN HE, RICKY WINATA. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Thu 08/19 10:12 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney John Troy to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): attach Civil Cover Sheet PDF form only. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Related Case Statement Thu 08/19 10:13 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney John Troy, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 08/19 10:15 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Troy. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Nassau. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 08/19 10:17 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 08/19 10:17 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar Thu 08/19 10:18 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 1:18-cv-6442. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 08/19 10:28 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Troy to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): defendant party name error; defendant name listed (HUIQIN HE) does not correspond to pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 18, 2021
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 08/18 3:40 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to A CANAAN 168 INC d/b/a Canaan Sushi; RICKY WANTA; HUIQIN HE a/k/a Hui Qin He; and MIN CHEN, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Shiqiang Gao..(Troy, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 08/18 3:38 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Troy, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 01 Related Case Statement /gd
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/18 3:36 PM
COMPLAINT against A CANAAN 168 INC, MIN CHEN, HUI QIN HE, RICKY WINATA. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24951442)Document filed by Shiqiang Gao..(Troy, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 01 Notice to Enforce Shareholder Liability /gd,
Att: 2 Exhibit 02 Notice to Inspect Share Records /gd,
Att: 3 Exhibit 03 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff Shiqiang Gao /gd,
Att: 4 Exhibit 04 Document Preservation Demand /gd,
Att: 5 Exhibit 05 Notice of Lien and Assignment,
Att: 6 Exhibit 06 Notice that Retaliation is Illegal under FLSA and NYLL /gd,
Att: 7 Exhibit 07 Notice that Settlement Under the Table is Prohibited /gd