Cross v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-02662 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Aug 19, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 15, 2022 5:28 AM EST |
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DuPont de Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
individually and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Incorporated
2 Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Cross
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 06/10 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(London, Michael) |
|
Monday, October 18, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Status Report
Mon 10/18 2:34 PM
STATUS REPORT - Defendant BASF Corporation's General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by BASF Corporation, BASF Corp, BASF Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Friday, August 20, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 08/20 2:16 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Cross v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-2662-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern Kentucky (sshe, ) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 08/20 2:15 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, August 19, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 08/20 2:14 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10026364.), filed by Patrick Cross. Service due by 11/17/2021(sshe, ) |