Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:21-cv-06514
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2021
Terminated:Oct 12, 2021
Case in other court:Illinois Central, 2:21-cv-02112
Last checked: Saturday Feb 19, 2022 1:11 AM PST
Defendant
Monsanto Company, Inc.
Represented By
Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Shook Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Judith Hanson
Represented By
David Q. Houbeck
Vandeveer Garzia, PC
contact info
David B. Timmis
Vandeveer Garzia
contact info
Plaintiff
Larry Hanson
Represented By
David Q. Houbeck
Vandeveer Garzia, PC
contact info
David B. Timmis
Vandeveer Garzia
contact info


Docket last updated: 88 minutes ago
Monday, December 02, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 12/02 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Larry Hanson, Judith Hanson (Timmis, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
10 10 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 09/07 11:45 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company, Inc.. [RE: Plaintiff Larry hanson, et al.] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
9 9 respoth Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 09/07 11:44 AM
Answer to Amended Complaint [RE: Plaintiff Larry Hanson et al.] byMonsanto Company, Inc.. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 23, 2021
8 8 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Mon 08/23 4:36 PM
Case transferred in from District of Illinois Central; Case Number 2:21-cv-02112. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
7 7 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Mon 08/23 2:04 PM
CERTIFIED COPY of Conditional Transfer Order entered by Clerk, MDL Panel, transferring this case to the ND CA. This case is terminated. (TC)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Letter Mon 08/23 1:40 PM
MDL Remark: CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-283) - 7 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in CAS/3:21-cv-01336, 1 in ILC/2:21-cv-02112, 1 in KYW/3:21-cv-00506, 2428 in MDL No. 2741, 1 in MIE/2:21-cv-11407, 1 in MN/0:21-cv-01436, 1 in MN/0:21-cv-01833, 1 in MOE/4:21-cv-00518) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 8/23/2021. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2741, CAS/3:21-cv-01336, ILC/2:21-cv-02112, KYW/3:21-cv-00506, MIE/2:21-cv-11407, MN/0:21-cv-01436, MN/0:21-cv-01833, MOE/4:21-cv-00518 (CMD) (TC) Modified on 8/23/2021 to correct entry (TC). (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/23/2021) (TC)
Related: [-]
misc Letter Mon 08/23 1:38 PM
MDL Remark ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY*** MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-283) Finalized on 8/23/21. Please see pleading (3 in CAS/3:21-cv-01336, 3 in ILC/2:21-cv-02112, 3 in KYW/3:21-cv-00506, 2445 in MDL No. 2741, 3 in MIE/2:21-cv-11407, 3 in MN/0:21-cv-01436, 3 in MN/0:21-cv-01833, 3 in MOE/4:21-cv-00518). As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. California for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 8/23/2021. (TC)
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Mon 08/23 4:37 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2741: Central District of Illinois, 2:21-cv-02112-CSB-EIL, Hanson v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-06514-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 283 cc: JPMDL (wsnS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 20, 2021
5 5 Letter to Leonard Sharp re Check for Filing Fee. Check returned to Plaintiff by mail as the incorrect amount was sent in. (DS)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 16, 2021
4 4 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company Inc. (Mailed to Plaintiff's counsel for service.) (TC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/29/2021. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint adequately alleges diversity jurisdiction. The Court's Order to Show Cause2 is DISCHARGED.(BMG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
3 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company Inc, filed by Larry Hanson, Judith Hanson.(Timmis, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 27, 2021
2 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 5/27/2021. Plaintiff has 21 days from entry of this order to comply. See written Order.(BMG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 26, 2021
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3674869.), filed by Larry Hanson, Judith Hanson.(Timmis, David)
Related: [-]