USA v. Bateman
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Case #: | 1:21-cr-00329 |
Case Filed: | Aug 25, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 12:03 PM EDT |
Defendant
Deanthony Bateman (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2024 5:29 PM EDT |
Friday, June 12, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 16 pgs MAGISTRATE COMPLAINT as to Deanthony Bateman (1). (jpa) [1:20-mj-00470-CCB] | |
2 | 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly as to Deanthony Bateman (jpa) [1:20-mj-00470-CCB] | |
Monday, July 13, 2020 | ||
Attorney update in case as to Deanthony Bateman. Attorney Katryna Lyn Spearman for Deanthony Bateman added. (jpa) [1:20-mj-00470-CCB] | ||
3 | 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Deanthony Bateman. Defendant WAIVES preliminary hearing. WAIVER FILED. Bond Hearing. Bond set at $10,000.00. Bond filed; defendant released. (Tape #FTR) (jpa) [1:20-mj-00470-CCB] | |
4 | 4 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Deanthony Bateman. (jpa) [1:20-mj-00470-CCB] | |
5 | 5 Appearance and Compliance Bond Entered as to Deanthony Bateman in amount of $ 10,000.00 (or). (jpa) [1:20-mj-00470-CCB] | |
6 | 6 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Deanthony Bateman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 7/13/20. (jpa) [1:20-mj-00470-CCB] | |
Friday, July 17, 2020 | ||
7 | 7 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 7/13/2020 as to Deanthony Bateman. (ddm) [1:20-mj-00470-CCB] | |
Tuesday, August 11, 2020 | ||
8 | 8 Joint MOTION to Continue by USA as to Deanthony Bateman. (Krepp, Thomas) [1:20-mj-00470-CCB] | |
Thursday, August 13, 2020 | ||
9 | 9 ORDER GRANTING8 joint motion to extend the time to indict or formally charge Deanthony Bateman. The time for the Government to obtain an indictment or an information is extended through and including September 12, 2020. Failure to do so by that time will result in the dismissal of the above-styled complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 8/13/20. (jtj) [1:20-mj-00470-CCB] | |
Friday, September 11, 2020 | ||
10 | 10 Joint MOTION to Continue by USA as to Deanthony Bateman. (Krepp, Thomas) [1:20-mj-00470-CCB] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, September 14, 2020 | ||
11 | 11 2 pgs ORDER GRANTING10 Motion for Continuance of the time within which the Government must indict as to Deanthony Bateman (1) through 10/12/2020. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the period between the date of the motion to continue, September 11, 2020, and the date the Government must formally charge the Defendant, October 12, 2020, shall be excluded pursuant to the Speedy Trial Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 9/14/20. (jpa) [1:20-mj-00470-CCB] | |
Saturday, November 28, 2020 | ||
12 | 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joshua S. Lowther appearing on behalf of Deanthony Bateman (Lowther, Joshua) [1:20-mj-00470-CCB] | |
Wednesday, August 25, 2021 | ||
13 | 13 7 pgs INDICTMENT with FORFEITURE PROVISION as to Deanthony Bateman (1) count(s) 1, 2-5. (rlh) | |
14 | 14 1 pgs Praecipe filed. Arrest Warrant Issued and delivered to USM on 8/25/21 as to Deanthony Bateman (rlh) | |
15 | 15 1 pgs Defendant Information Sheet as to Deanthony Bateman. (rlh) |