Charlene Simmons v. GlaxoSmithKline, LLC et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:21-cv-81539 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 30, 2021 |
Terminated: | Sep 14, 2021 |
Case in other court: | California Central, 2:21-cv-06465 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 26, 2022 5:13 AM EST |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Does
1 through 100, inclusive 251 174th Street
Miami Beach, FL 33160 |
|
Defendant
Garfield Beach CVS, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Glaxosmithkline LLC
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer Inc
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Charlene Simmons
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 14, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
order
Administrative Order
Tue 09/14 4:34 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Monday, August 30, 2021 | ||
16 | 16 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Central District of California. Case Number 2:21-cv-06465 with documents 1-13. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81539-RLR Charlene Simmons v. GlaxoSmithKline, LLC et al on 8/30/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 73. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) | |
15 | 15 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) | |
14 | 14
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Mon 08/30 3:49 PM
Case transferred in from California Central; Case Number 2:21-cv-06465. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc). |
|
Friday, August 27, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
order
MDL Conditional Transfer Order
Mon 08/30 11:58 AM
Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-73) from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2924, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of Florida for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings, and with the consent of that court, assigned to Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
Wednesday, August 18, 2021 | ||
12 | 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Charlene Simmons(Rueb, Gregory) | |
Tuesday, August 17, 2021 | ||
11 | 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Parties, filed by Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Blaschke, Matthew) | |
Monday, August 16, 2021 | ||
10 | 10 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (droj) | |
9 | 9 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 21-01 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson to the calendar of Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:21-cv-06465 JAK (MAAx). (esa) | |
8 | 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation. (Blaschke, Matthew) | |
Friday, August 13, 2021 | ||
7 | 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet should be e-filed separately. The correct event category is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings.. (car) | |
6 | 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) | |
5 | 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) | |
4 | 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (car) | |
Thursday, August 12, 2021 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, identifying Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, and Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH. (Blaschke, Matthew) | |
2 | 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation identifying Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, and Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH as Corporate Parent. (Blaschke, Matthew) | |
Wednesday, August 11, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Los Angeles County, California, case number 21STCV24150 Receipt No: ACACDC-31785310 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attorney Matthew James Blaschke added to party Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew James Blaschke added to party Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation(pty:dft))(Blaschke, Matthew) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint | ||
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Does 1 through 100, inclusive, GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Charlene Simmons. Filed in State Court on 6/30/2021 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal1 (car) |