Watson v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Referred: | Bruce E Reinhart |
Case #: | 9:21-cv-81555 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Sep 01, 2021 |
Terminated: | Sep 14, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 28, 2022 4:55 AM EST |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chattem, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Watson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 14, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
order
Administrative Order
Tue 09/14 4:34 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Wednesday, September 01, 2021 | ||
3 | 3 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81555-RLR Watson v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) | |
2 | 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz) | |
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/01 3:28 PM
COMPLAINT - SHORT FORM - against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14977877, filed by Dennis Watson.(Boldt, Paige) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Create Case Association
Wed 09/01 3:54 PM
Cases associated 9:20-md-2924-RLR. (mc) |
||
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 09/01 3:36 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz) |
||
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Wed 09/01 3:59 PM
MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81555-RLR Watson v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) |