Village of Waterloo v. The 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-02812 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 31, 2021 |
Case in other court: | New York Western, 1:21-cv-00890 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 27, 2022 3:59 AM EST |
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C.
individually and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The 3M Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
individually and as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
individually and as successor in interest to Ciba Inc 100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Village of Waterloo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 07/08 4:37 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by The 3M Company, 3M Company, The, 3M Company, The 3M Company, The 3M Company, 3M Company, The 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co). List of cases for dismissal)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, September 28, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Status Report
Tue 09/28 6:54 PM
STATUS REPORT - Defendant BASF Corporation's General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by BASF Corp, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, September 01, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 09/01 3:01 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Western, 1:21-cv-00890, Village of Waterloo v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-2812-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 09/01 2:52 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 1:21-cv-00890. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, August 31, 2021 | ||
5 | 5 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER to the District of South Carolina. Signed by John W. Nichols,Clerk of the Panel on 8/30/2021. (KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 9/1/2021.] | |
Monday, August 16, 2021 | ||
4 | 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chemguard Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for Chemguard Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP.. (Horn, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 9/1/2021.] | |
Tuesday, August 10, 2021 | ||
3 | 3 TEXT ORDER: The stipulation to extend the time to respond, Docket Item2 , is HEREBY SO ORDERED. The parties shall file a status update regarding the AFFF MDL every 60 days. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 8/10/2021. (MLA) [Transferred from New York Western on 9/1/2021.] | |
ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 9/1/2021.] | ||
Monday, August 09, 2021 | ||
2 | 2 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond by Chemguard Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Horn, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 9/1/2021.] | |
Friday, August 06, 2021 | ||
Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK) [Transferred from New York Western on 9/1/2021.] | ||
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at[LINK:http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution] .(TMK) [Transferred from New York Western on 9/1/2021.] | ||
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (TMK) [Transferred from New York Western on 9/1/2021.] | ||
Thursday, August 05, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chemguard Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP from Supreme Court of New York, Seneca County, case number 20210309. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0209-4324330), filed by Chemguard Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP.(Horn, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 9/1/2021.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service |