(PC)Garrett v. Amador County Sheriff Department et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Troy L Nunley |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-01624 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 10, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jan 11, 2022 |
Defendant
Amador County Sheriff Department
|
|
Defendant
City of Jackson
|
|
Defendant
District Attorney's Office
|
|
Plaintiff
Cameo Loree Garrett
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, January 24, 2022 | ||
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 01/28 8:59 AM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, NIC:8 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations and9 Judgment sent to Cameo Loree Garrett. Notice of Change of Address due by 4/4/2022. (Coll, A) |
||
Tuesday, January 11, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment
Tue 01/11 10:44 AM
JUDGMENT dated *1/11/2022* pursuant to order signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/10/2022. (Huang, H) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 01/11 10:39 AM
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/10/2022 ADOPTING7 Findings and Recommendations in full, and DISMISSING this action without prejudice.CASE CLOSED. (Huang, H) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Tue 01/11 10:44 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:8 Order and9 Judgment served on Cameo Loree Garrett. (Huang, H) |
||
Monday, November 29, 2021 | ||
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 11/30 5:18 PM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, RTS, Not in custody, no mail receptacle, unable to forward:7 Order and Findings and Recommendations, sent to Cameo Loree Garrett. Notice of Change of Address due by 2/7/2022. |
||
Tuesday, November 16, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Findings and Recommendations Order
Tue 11/16 9:24 AM
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/16/2021 ORDERING Clerk to randomly assign a U.S. District Judge to this case and RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Assigned and referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R) |
|
misc
Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case
Tue 11/16 9:22 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. The new case number is: 2:21-cv-1624 TLN EFB (PC). (Henshaw, R) |
||
service
Service by Mail
Tue 11/16 9:24 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:7 Order and Findings and Recommendations served on Cameo Loree Garrett. (Henshaw, R) |
||
Tuesday, September 28, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 09/28 9:08 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/28/2021 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of service of this order, a certified trust account statement to complete his request to proceed IFP. (Henshaw, R) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Tue 09/28 9:08 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:5 Order served on Cameo Loree Garrett. (Henshaw, R) |
||
Friday, September 24, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
motion
In Forma Pauperis
Mon 09/27 8:28 AM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Cameo Loree Garrett. (Tupolo, A) |
|
Wednesday, September 15, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 09/15 10:34 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/15/2021 ORDERING plaintiff must submit either the filing fee or the application required by § 1915(a) within 30 days. The Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a form application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this action. (Yin, K) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Wed 09/15 10:36 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Order and ifp application served on Cameo Loree Garrett. (Yin, K) |
||
Monday, September 13, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
order
Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider
Mon 09/13 11:55 AM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 10/18/2021 |
|
Att: 1 Litigant Letter | ||
service
Service by Mail
Mon 09/13 11:55 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Cameo Loree Garrett. |
||
Friday, September 10, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint
Mon 09/13 11:54 AM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Defendants by Cameo Loree Garrett |