Kennedy v. Cavalier Mineral Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Gregory R Schaaf |
Case #: | 5:21-ap-05162 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Sep 13, 2021 |
Terminated: | Apr 20, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Cavalier Mineral Inc.
25505 CardMountain Road
Mouthcard, KY 41548 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ellen Arvin Kennedy, solely in her capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the Cambrian Liquidating Trust
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP 100 West Main Street Suite 900
Lexington, KY 40507 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 20, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 04/20 9:41 AM
Adversary Proceeding 21-5162 Closed. (rah) |
||
Tuesday, April 05, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (awd) |
|
Monday, April 04, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Proposed Order submitted by John M. Spires on behalf of Cavalier Mineral Inc., Ellen Arvin Kennedy. (Spires, John) |
|
Wednesday, February 02, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Certificate of Service , filed by John M. Spires . (Spires, John) |
|
Tuesday, February 01, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Amended Order for Trial. Trial set for 6/14/2022 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (lmu) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Order GRANTING Joint Motion to Vacate Order for Trial . (lmu) |
|
Monday, January 31, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Motion to Vacate Trial Order, or in the Alternative, Extend Deadlines filed by Cavalier Mineral Inc., Ellen Arvin Kennedy (Spires, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, November 23, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Certificate of Service , filed by John M. Spires. (Spires, John). Related document(s)10 Order for Trial. Modified on 11/24/2021. (awd) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Order for Trial Trial date set for 3/22/2022 at 9:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (awd) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
Wednesday, November 10, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Answer to Complaint Filed by Cavalier Mineral Inc. . (Lowe, Timothy) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Receipt Information from District Court . (tb) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Order GRANTING Motion of Mark L. Esposito to Appear pro hac vice Payment Due: 11/24/2021. (alf) |
|
Tuesday, November 09, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Proposed Order submitted by Timothy K. Lowe on behalf of Cavalier Mineral Inc. . (Lowe, Timothy) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Motion to Appear pro hac vice,filed by Cavalier Mineral Inc.. (Lowe, Timothy) |
|
Wednesday, September 15, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Service Executed.. (Spires, John) |
|
Tuesday, September 14, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (awd) |
|
2 | 2
court
Entry
Tue 09/14 3:06 PM
Entry - See Bankruptcy Case No. 19-51200 (ECF No. 1668) for the Order which establishes procedures re filing fees, summons and orders for trial for this proceeding. (awd) |
|
Monday, September 13, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-05162 Complaint, filed by Ellen Arvin Kennedy against Cavalier Mineral Inc. Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Spires, John) |