Beard v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-02986 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Sep 16, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 15, 2022 4:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell International Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BASF Corp
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Coporation Trust Company 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Stanley Beard
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/06 12:56 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PlaintiffsAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Primeau, Robin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw
Wed 07/03 12:36 PM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case Nos. as listed on Motion The Court GRANTS 5244 (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al) Motion to Withdraw Kurt D Weaver and Sonny S Haynes And Substitute Stephen D Feldman, Gregory L Skidmore, and Amanda Pickens Nitto as Counsel of Record for Honeywell Defendants. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 7/3/2024.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Withdraw
Tue 07/02 3:30 PM
MOTION to Withdraw And Substitute Counsel of Record for Honeywell Defendants by Honeywell International Inc. Response to Motion due by 7/16/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Weaver, Kurt) |
|
Monday, November 15, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Status Report
Mon 11/15 9:38 PM
STATUS REPORT General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Honeywell International Inc, Honeywell International Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Shealy, Kirby) |
|
Tuesday, November 02, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Status Report
Tue 11/02 6:52 PM
STATUS REPORT - Defendant BASF Corporation's General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corp, BASF Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, October 21, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 10/21 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt D Weaver on behalf of Honeywell International Inc, Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Weaver, Kurt) |
|
Thursday, September 16, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 09/16 4:54 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Beard v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-2986-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Arizona (sshe, ) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 09/16 4:53 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/16 4:53 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10076291.), filed by Stanley Beard. Service due by 12/15/2021(sshe, ) |